Thomas v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Brendon L. Thomas
Defendant: Dee Smith and Alabama Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2023cv00248
Filed: July 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #3 Response to Order by Brendon L. Thomas; ref to Judge Nelson. (cmj)
July 17, 2023 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER re: #2 Order, Set Deadlines by Brendon L. Thomas filed by Brendon L. Thomas; ref to Judge Neslon. (cmj)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order for plaintiff to either pay filing fee or file IFP motion no later than 7/24/23. ( IFP or Filing Fee due by 7/24/2023.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/10/23. (cmj) (copy of order and IFP form mailed to plaintiff)
July 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama Credit Union, Dee Smith, filed by Brendon L. Thomas. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit of Financial Status); ref to Judge Nelson (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendon L. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?