PowerSouth Energy Cooperative v. Casey Industrial, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PowerSouth Energy Cooperative
Defendant: Casey Industrial, Inc., Barnhard Crane and Rigging, LLC, Barnhard Crane and Rigging Co. and Barnhard Crane and Rigging Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00250
Filed: July 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Danner Frazer, Jr on behalf of Casey Industrial, Inc. (Frazer, Albert)
August 8, 2023 Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answers due from Barnhard Crane and Rigging Co., Barnhard Crane and Rigging, LLC, and Casey Industrial, Inc. on 10/9/2023. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 08/08/2023. (jil)
August 8, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Casey Industrial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Transfer Venue) (Upchurch, Michael)
August 8, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer referred to Judge Beaverstock. (mbp)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aaron C. Schepler. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 07/24/2023. (Murray, P.)
July 24, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION and APPLICATION for Aaron C. Schepler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (cmj)
July 21, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION and APPLICATION for Aaron C. Schepler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-3239121, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Barnhard Crane and Rigging Co., Barnhard Crane and Rigging, LLC. (Schepler, Aaron)
July 20, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Halron W. Turner on behalf of PowerSouth Energy Cooperative (Turner, Halron)
July 18, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John Evans Bailey on behalf of PowerSouth Energy Cooperative (Bailey, John)
July 13, 2023 Filing 14 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Disclosure Statement #8 filed by Defendant Casey Industrial, Inc. reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
July 13, 2023 Filing 13 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Defendants Barnhart Crane and Rigging, LLC and Barnhart Crane and Rigging Co. reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
July 13, 2023 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Plaintiff PowerSouth Energy Cooperative reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
July 12, 2023 Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answers due from Defendants Barnhart Crane and Rigging, LLC; Barnhart Crane and Rigging Co.; and Casey Industrial, Inc. on 8/9/2023. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 07/12/2023. (jil)
July 12, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend the Time for Defendants to File Their Initial Responsive Pleadings by Barnhard Crane and Rigging Co., Barnhard Crane and Rigging, LLC, Casey Industrial, Inc.. (Collier, Stephen)
July 12, 2023 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Barnhard Crane and Rigging Co., Barnhard Crane and Rigging, LLC, Casey Industrial, Inc. (SEE IMAGE AT DOC. 10). (cmj)
July 10, 2023 Filing 9 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray and is now assigned to the docket of Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
July 10, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Casey Industrial, Inc., MasTec Power Corporation identifying Corporate Parent MasTec Power Corporation for Casey Industrial, Inc... (Upchurch, Michael)
July 10, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Barnhard Crane and Rigging Co., Barnhard Crane and Rigging, LLC, Barnhart Crane and Rigging Co., Barnhart Crane and Rigging Co. identifying Corporate Parent Barnhart Crane and Rigging Co. for Barnhard Crane and Rigging Co., Barnhard Crane and Rigging, LLC.. (Collier, Stephen)
July 10, 2023 Defendants' Answers are due to be filed pursuant to FRCP 81(c). (cmj)
July 7, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff PowerSouth Energy Cooperative. (Bailey, Dennis)
July 6, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Casey Industrial, Inc., MasTec Power identifying Corporate Parent MasTec Power for Casey Industrial, Inc... (Upchurch, Michael)
July 6, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
July 5, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Blair G. Mattei on behalf of Casey Industrial, Inc. (Mattei, Blair)
July 5, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Upchurch on behalf of Casey Industrial, Inc. (Upchurch, Michael)
July 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Barnhard Crane and Rigging Co., Barnhard Crane and Rigging, LLC, Casey Industrial, Inc. ($402.00; Receipt# AALSDC-3228756) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Collier, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2023: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PowerSouth Energy Cooperative v. Casey Industrial, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PowerSouth Energy Cooperative
Represented By: Charles A. Stakely
Represented By: Dennis R. Bailey
Represented By: John Evans Bailey
Represented By: Halron W. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Industrial, Inc.
Represented By: Blair G. Mattei
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Collier
Represented By: Albert Danner Frazer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnhard Crane and Rigging, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Collier
Represented By: Aaron Schepler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnhard Crane and Rigging Co.
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Collier
Represented By: Aaron Schepler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnhard Crane and Rigging Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?