Alfa Mutual Insurance Company v. Smith Tractor Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Alfa Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Smith Tractor, Inc. and Smith Tractor Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00301
Filed: August 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
2 Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER, Rule 16(b): Pretrial Conference set before Judge Terry F. Moorer for 11/8/2024 at 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. Jury Selection set before Judge Moorer on 12/3/2024 at 8:45 AM. Jury Trial is set before Judge Moorer for the December 2024 term; ETT 3-4 days. Discovery cutoff 6/7/2024. Motions for leave to amend pleadings due by 10/20/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 6/28/2024. Position Regarding Settlement due by 6/7/2024. Fictitious parties set out in the complaint are STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 9/29/2023. (Attachment: #1 Judge Moorer's Standing Pretrial Order) (mab) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 29, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/29/2023. (cmj)
September 27, 2023 Set Telephonic Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference via telephone set for 9/29/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling Jr. Call-in information emailed to attorneys. (cmj)
September 26, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Endorsement by Smith Tractor Co., Inc. re: #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Coleman, Thomas)
September 26, 2023 REFERRAL OF #16 Notice of Endorsement of #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Milling. (mab)
September 25, 2023 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Gatling, Michael)
September 25, 2023 REFERRAL OF #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Milling. (Note: need notice of endorsement from Attorney Coleman) (mab)
September 18, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Filing Defendant's Initial Disclosures filed by Smith Tractor Co., Inc.. (Coleman, Thomas)
September 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Gatling, Michael)
September 6, 2023 Filing 12 Documents endorsed NOTED by District Judge Terry F. Moorer: #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company, #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Smith Tractor Co., Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (tot)
August 25, 2023 Filing 11 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #10 filed by Smith Tractor Co., Inc. (Milling, Bert)
August 24, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Smith Tractor Co., Inc.. (Coleman, Thomas)
August 23, 2023 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #8 filed by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company (Milling, Bert)
August 22, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Alfa Mutual Insurance Company. (Gatling, Michael)
August 14, 2023 Due to a conflict, Case Reassigned to District Judge Terry F. Moorer. District Judge Kristi K. DuBose no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-M after the case number on all future pleadings. (meh)
August 11, 2023 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Alfa Mutual Insurance Company (Milling, Bert)
August 10, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Alfa Mutual Insurance Company. (Gatling, Michael)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 8/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (meh)
August 9, 2023 Filing 4 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Smith Tractor, Inc. (Milling, Bert)
August 9, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Smith Tractor, Inc.. (Coleman, Thomas)
August 9, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Smith Tractor, Inc.. (Coleman, Thomas)
August 9, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-3249937, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Smith Tractor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint) (Coleman, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2023: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfa Mutual Insurance Company v. Smith Tractor Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfa Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Gatling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Tractor, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Tractor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Leslie Minor
Represented By: Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?