Giles v. Hamilton Home Builders, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Elizabeth Giles
Defendant: Hamilton Home Builders, LLC, Regional Enterprises, LLC doing business as Regional Home Center of Mobile and 21st Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv00323
Filed: August 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Regional Enterprises, LLC's, D/B/A Regional Home Center of Mobile ("Regional"), #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #23 Response to Motion. Regional's Reply shall by due by 11/3/2023. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/18/2023. (fwd)
October 17, 2023 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 Response to Motion, filed by Regional Enterprises, LLC. (Little, Justin)
October 17, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 Response to Motion. Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
October 13, 2023 REFERRAL OF #23 Response to Motion to Judge DuBose. (jmr)
October 12, 2023 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Regional Home Centers LLC, et al filed by Jacqueline Elizabeth Giles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Riemer, Kenneth)
October 3, 2023 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion #6 TO DISMISS OR STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION filed by Hamilton Home Builders, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Construction Arbitration Rules Fact Sheet for Arbitrators Updated October 23, 2007, #2 Exhibit 2 - August 1, 2018 version of the AAA Home Construction Fact Sheet for Parties and Arbitrators) (Ritchey, Gregory)
October 3, 2023 REFERRAL OF #22 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge DuBose. (meh)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 21st Century Mortgage Corporation's Unopposed Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint within fourteen (14) days after the Court's decision on the pending motions to compel arbitration. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/29/2023. (khc)
September 28, 2023 Filing 20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant 21st Mortgage Corporation's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by 21st Mortgage Corporation. (Lester, James)
September 28, 2023 REFERRAL OF #19 Response to Motion to Judge DuBose. (meh)
September 27, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re: #6 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Jacqueline Elizabeth Giles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -Hamilton Warranty, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Statement of Claims - AAA, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Consumer Rules Fee Schedule, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 05.01.23 Hamilton Objection letter, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 05.16.23 Giles Objection, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 05.30.23 Hamilton letter, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 07.15.09 AAA Letter, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 06.16.23 AAA Email, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 Home Construction Fee Schedule, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 07.20.23 AAA Email, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 AAA Construction Industry Arbitration Fee Schedule, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 Giles Declaration, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 07.25.23 Email WD Claim, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14 AAA Consumer Due Process Protocol) (Riemer, Kenneth)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response to Regional Home Centers LLC d/b/a Regional Home Center of Mobile Motion for Stay of Proceedings and to Compel Arbitration shall be due by 10/12/2023 and Defendant's Reply shall be due by 10/19/2023. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/20/23. (khc)
September 20, 2023 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response to Regional Home Centers LLC d/b/a Regional Home Center of Mobile Motion for Stay of Proceedings and to Compel Arbitration filed by Jacqueline Elizabeth Giles. (Riemer, Kenneth)
September 20, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response to Regional Home Centers LLC d/b/a Regional Home Center of Mobile Motion for Stay of Proceedings and to Compel Arbitration. Referred to Judge Kristi K. DuBose. (jmr)
September 18, 2023 Filing 16 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Regional Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Regional Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Hamilton Home Builders, LLC. Review of the corporate disclosure statements has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order re: #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Regional Enterprises, LLC. Plaintiff's Response to Motion due on or before 9/27/2023. Defendant Regional shall Reply by 10/4/2023. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/12/2023. (meh)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Defendant 21st Mortgage Corporation's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant 21st Mortgage shall, on or before September 29, 2023, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/12/2023. (khc)
September 7, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel Arbitration Referred to Judge Kristi K. DuBose. (jmr)
August 31, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and #13 MOTION for Extension of Time DEFENDANT 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATIONS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
August 30, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time DEFENDANT 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATIONS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by 21st Mortgage Corporation. (Lester, James)
August 30, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Regional Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2) (Little, Justin)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Hamilton Home Builders' Motion to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration. Plaintiff's response is due on or before September 27, 2023, and Defendants' reply is due on or before October 4, 2023. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/5/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/30/23. (lto)
August 28, 2023 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant Hamilton Home Builders' Motion to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Jacqueline Elizabeth Giles. (Riemer, Kenneth)
August 28, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant Hamilton Home Builders' Motion to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (meh)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On August 24, 2023, Defendant Hamilton Home Builders, LLC, filed a Motion to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration. (Doc. 6). Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a response to Defendant's motion on or before September 7, 2023. Defendant is ORDERED to file its reply, if any, on or before September 14, 2023, at which time the Court will take the motion under submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/25/23. (lto)
August 25, 2023 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Defendant Hamilton Home Builders, LLC reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
August 24, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Hamilton Home Builders, LLC. (Ritchey, Gregory)
August 24, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay , MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Hamilton Home Builders, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - redacted invoice, #3 Exhibit C - Bill of Lading, #4 Exhibit D - Limited Warranty, #5 Exhibit E - Work Orders, #6 Exhibit F - Demand for Arbitration, #7 Exhibit G - Lt to AAA, #8 Exhibit H - 5-1-23 email from AAA, #9 Exhibit I - 6-16-23 email from AAA, #10 Exhibit J - 7-25-23 email from AAA closing file) (Ritchey, Gregory)
August 24, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel Arbitration . Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (meh)
August 23, 2023 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Regional Enterprises, LLC, and the Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Regional Enterprises of AL, LLC reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
August 23, 2023 Filing 4 Answer due from All Defendants pursuant to FRCP 81(c). (meh)
August 23, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Regional Enterprises, LLC. (Little, Justin)
August 23, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Regional Enterprises, LLC, Regional Holdings Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Regional Holdings Corp. for Regional Enterprises, LLC.. (Little, Justin)
August 23, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt number AALSDC-3257948, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Regional Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Little, Justin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2023: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giles v. Hamilton Home Builders, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Elizabeth Giles
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Home Builders, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Scotch Ritchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Enterprises, LLC doing business as Regional Home Center of Mobile
Represented By: William Ellis McCartney
Represented By: Justin Barrett Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: James Conrad Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?