Mitchell v. State Of Alabama
Plaintiff: Virgil Mitchell
Defendant: State Of Alabama
Case Number: 1:2023cv00325
Filed: August 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Objection to #10 Report and Recommendation, filed by Virgil Mitchell; referred to Judge Moorer (mab)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Objection to #10 Report and Recommendation, filed by Virgil Mitchell; referred to Judge Moorer (mab)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Information re: Objections by Virgil Mitchell. (Referred to J/Moorer on 10/12/23) (tot)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that action be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff Mitchell's failure to prosecute and comply with the Court's orders. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/4/2023. (copy to Pltf 10/4/23) (mab)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Amend pursuant to Rule 15 filed by Virgil Mitchell; Referred to Judge William E. Cassady(PSU) (mab)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF Objections (Docs. #7 , #8 ) to Orders (Docs. #4 , #6 ) to Judge Moorer. (mab)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Objection to #6 Order filed by Virgil Mitchell. (Referred to MJ/Cassady(PSU) on 9/19/23) (tot)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Objection to #4 Order filed by Virgil Mitchell. (Referred to MJ/Cassady(PSU) on 9/19/23) (tot)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re: #5 Objection to Court's Order. Plf is to re-file his complaint NLT 9/29/2023 as set out. Plf is also to pay the $402 filing fee or file a conforming motion to proceed without prepayment of fees by 9/29/2023 as previously ordered by this Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send to Plf the forms for a complaint for prisoner actions under 42 U.S.C. 1983 & for a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/11/23. (copy to Plf w/forms on 9/11/23) (tot)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Objection to #3 Order, filed by Virgil Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit); referred to Judge Cassady(PSU) (mab)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED ORDER, amending #3 Order for sole purpose of correcting the amount of the filing to be $402.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/31/2023. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order, Plf is to re-file his complaint on the form required by this Court & file a conforming motion to proceed without prepayment of fees by 9/29/2023 as set out. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send to Plf the form for a complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983 & the form for a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/29/23. (copy mailed to Plf w/forms on 8/29/23) (tot)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order, action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/28/2023. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Of Alabama, filed by Virgil Mitchell. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/22/2023. (No IFP Motion; fee not paid); referred to Judge Cassady(PSU) (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. State Of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?