Doe v. Spring Hill College et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Spring Hill College, Craig McVey, William Robert Tate and Terrence Joseph Gennari
Case Number: 1:2023cv00340
Filed: September 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Title IX Educational Amendments 1992 - Sex Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #25 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (mbp)
October 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion #12 filed by John Doe. (Johnston, Jamie)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE to #20 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Craig McVey, Spring Hill College. (Pennington, James)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #24 Response to Judge Beaverstock. (fz)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to #21 Reply to Response to Motion, #20 Reply to Response to Motion filed by William Robert Tate. (Graham, Lisha)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #23 Reply to Judge Beaverstock. (fz)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re: #12 MOTION Proceed with Fictitious Name filed by John Doe. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2023 at 1:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 10/17/2023. (fz)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #21 Reply to Response to Motion, #20 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (fz)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion #12 filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration by John Doe, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Johnston, Jamie)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion #12 filed by John Doe. (Johnston, Jamie)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lana Elizabeth Bell on behalf of William Robert Tate (Bell, Lana)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisha L. Graham on behalf of William Robert Tate (Graham, Lisha)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION Proceed with Fictitious Name filed by William Robert Tate. (Seal, Curtis)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Hendrix Seal on behalf of William Robert Tate (Seal, Curtis)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re: #12 MOTION Proceed with Fictitious Name filed by Craig McVey, Spring Hill College. (Pennington, James)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #15 Response to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (fz)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #17 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (fz)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order re: #12 MOTION Proceed with Fictitious Name filed by John Doe. Defendants shall file a response by 10/10/2023. Plaintiff may file a reply by 10/17/2023. Motion to be taken under submission on 10/18/2023. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 10/3/23. (mbp)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION Proceed with Fictitious Name filed by John Doe. (Johnston, Jamie)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION Proceed with Fictitious Name to Judge Beaverstock. (fz)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF 13 Sealed Document(s) to Judge Beaverstock. (fz)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. William Robert Tate waiver sent on 9/28/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Johnston, Jamie)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Terrence Joseph Gennari served on 9/18/2023, answer due 10/10/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Certified Mail) (Johnston, Jamie)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Glenos on behalf of Craig McVey, Spring Hill College (Glenos, Amy)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Pennington on behalf of Craig McVey, Spring Hill College (Pennington, James)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Doe. (Johnston, Jamie)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. Spring Hill College waiver sent on 9/8/2023, answer due 11/7/2023. (Johnston, Jamie)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. Craig McVey waiver sent on 9/8/2023, answer due 11/7/2023. (Johnston, Jamie)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 9/7/2023. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 10/18/2023. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 09/07/2023. (fz)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Terrence Joseph Gennari, Craig McVey, Spring Hill College, William Robert Tate. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (fz)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by John Doe (Attachments: #1 Supplement Tate Summons, #2 Supplement McVey Summons, #3 Supplement Spring Hill Summons) (Johnston, Jamie)
September 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3264381, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by John Doe. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 12/4/2023. (Johnston, Jamie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2023: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Spring Hill College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Jamie Austin Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Hill College
Represented By: James C. Pennington
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Glenos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig McVey
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Glenos
Represented By: James C. Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Robert Tate
Represented By: Curtis Hendrix Seal
Represented By: Lana Elizabeth Bell
Represented By: Lisha L. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Joseph Gennari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?