Hartenfels v. Presley et al
Plaintiff: Robert B. Hartenfels
Defendant: Trevin G. Presley, Mid Star Timber Harvesting, Inc., Tammy Lucus and Triangle Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00345
Filed: September 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2023 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Triangle Insurance Company, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cjr)
October 31, 2023 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Tammy Lucus. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cjr)
October 31, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons for Triangle Insurance Company, Inc. by Robert B. Hartenfels. (Kannebecker, Charles)
October 31, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons for Tammy Lucus by Robert B. Hartenfels. (Kannebecker, Charles)
October 30, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mid Star Timber Harvesting, Inc., Trevin G. Presley, Tammy Lucus, Triangle Insurance Company, Inc., filed by Robert B. Hartenfels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Kannebecker, Charles)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #10 Motion for Charles Kannebecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/26/2023. (bld)
October 26, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION and APPLICATION for Charles Kannebecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-3292104, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Robert B. Hartenfels. (Kannebecker, Charles)
October 26, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION and APPLICATION for Charles Kannebecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. A to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (fz)
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Oscar Vann, Jr on behalf of Mid Star Timber Harvesting, Inc. (Vann, Dennis)
October 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Oliver, II on behalf of Mid Star Timber Harvesting, Inc. (Oliver, Thomas)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mid Star Timber Harvesting, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2023. Replies due by 11/6/2023. Motion to be taken under submission on 11/7/2023. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 10/16/2023. (fz)
October 16, 2023 Filing 6 Brief filed by Mid Star Timber Harvesting, Inc. re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Richmond, Lea)
October 16, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mid Star Timber Harvesting, Inc.. (Richmond, Lea)
September 27, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert B. Hartenfels. Mid Star Timber Harvesting, Inc. served on 9/25/2023, answer due 10/16/2023 (Lyons, T.)
September 7, 2023 Filing 3 Service Order entered 9/7/2023. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 10/23/2023. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 9/7/2023. (fz)
September 7, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mid Star Timber Harvesting, Inc., Trevin G. Presley. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (fz)
September 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number AALSDC-3266706, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Robert B. Hartenfels. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 12/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters of Admin, Boyd, #2 Exhibit Letters of Admin, Hartenfels, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Summons - Presley, #5 Supplement Summons - Mid Star Timber, #6 Supplement Pltf's Discovery to Def Presley, #7 Supplement Pltf's Discovery to Def Mid Star Timber) (Lyons, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartenfels v. Presley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B. Hartenfels
Represented By: T. Randall Lyons
Represented By: Charles Thomas Kannebecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevin G. Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid Star Timber Harvesting, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Oscar Vann, Jr.
Represented By: Lea Richmond, IV
Represented By: Thomas L. Oliver, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Lucus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triangle Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?