Morrissette v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Katherine Morrissette
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv00447
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Dennison Dowdell on behalf of All Defendants (Dowdell, Gabriel)
January 16, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley B. Gilchrist on behalf of All Defendants (Gilchrist, Wesley)
January 16, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Randall Little on behalf of All Defendants (Little, Jonathan)
January 16, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of All Defendants (Prater, Harlan)
January 16, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Morrow on behalf of All Defendants (Morrow, William)
November 28, 2023 Filing 10 SECOND OMNIBUS ORDER MODIFYING BELO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 12/17/21. (cjr)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C et al. (cjr)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order, #2 HIPAA Protective Order, #3 Authorization) (cjr)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-02656. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 11/21/2023. (rt) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]
November 20, 2023 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. and Plaintiff, Katherine Morrissette, Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]
July 26, 2023 Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl J Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (mb) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]
July 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10040931) filed by Katherine Morrissette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Katherine Morrissette(pty:pla).(Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrissette v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Morrissette
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Represented By: Gabriel Dennison Dowdell
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: Jonathan Randall Little
Represented By: William H. Morrow
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Gabriel Dennison Dowdell
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: Jonathan Randall Little
Represented By: William H. Morrow
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?