Williams v. Nexstar Media Group et al
Plaintiff: Wendy M. Williams
Defendant: Nexstar Media Group, Perry Sooks, Geoff Armstrong, WKRG, Bernadette Aulestia, Tony Wells and Martin Pumpador
Case Number: 1:2023cv00456
Filed: December 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
2 Judge: Terry F Moorer
3 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a second amended complaint that addresses and corrects the pleading deficiencies noted in this order and to either re-file her IFP motion or pay the $405.00 filing fee by 2/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/5/2024. Copy of this order and IFP motion mailed to plaintiff. (fz)
January 2, 2024 Case Reassigned to District Judge Kristi K. DuBose and Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. District Judge Terry F. Moorer, Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (fz)
December 29, 2023 Remark. Third duplicate copy of amended complaint mailed on 12/29/2023. (fz)
December 28, 2023 Filing 4 DUPLICATE Copy of #3 Amend Complaint against Geoff Armstrong, Bernadette Aulestia, Nexstar Media Group, Martin Pumpador, Perry Sooks, WKRG, Tony Wells, filed by Wendy M. Williams. (fz)
December 26, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wendy M. Williams. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (meh)
December 26, 2023 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Geoff Armstrong, Nexstar Media Group, Perry Sooks, Bernadette Aulestia, Tony Wells, WKRG and Martin Pumpador filed by Wendy M. Williams. Referred to Judge Nelson. (fz)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order, this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for consideration & disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/5/23. (copy mailed to Plf on 12/5/23) (tot)
December 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Geoff Armstrong, Nexstar Media Group, Perry Sooks filed by Wendy M. Williams. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 3/4/2024. (Referred to MJ/Nelson on 12/5/23) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Nexstar Media Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexstar Media Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Sooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoff Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WKRG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Aulestia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Pumpador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?