Longcrier v. HL-A Co., Inc.

Plaintiff: Deborah V. Longcrier
Defendant: HL-A Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv00011
Filed: January 9, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: Family & Medical Leave Act of 1993
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING the 84 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement and Dismissal With Prejudice. Pursuant to the parties' agreement, all claims in this action are dismissed with prejudice. Each party is responsible for bearing his, her or it s costs, attorney's fees and expenses, except as otherwise provided in the Joint Motion. Any named or opt-in plaintiff desiring to receive the settlement proceeds must sign the appropriate settlement documents not later than 90 days after the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 4/24/09. (tgw)
April 8, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 84 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement and Dismissal With Prejudice. The parties are ordered by 4/22/2009 to file a supplemental evidentiary submission detailing the factual and legal basis for their contention that the $10 3,000 proposed attorney's fee award for plaintiffs' counsel is reasonable and appropriate and also file a supplemental notice setting forth any extraordinary factual or legal circumstances that warrant this Court deviating from its usual practice and retaining jurisdiction over the enforcement of dozens of individual-specific settlement agreements and releases. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 4/8/09. (tgw)
April 7, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING the 71 MOTION to Dismiss the Claims of Gregory Pickett and Rosie Brown filed by HL-A Co., Inc. All claims brought by plaintiffs Gregory Pickett and Rosie Brown are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to appear for their properly noticed depositions and failure to undertake reasonable efforts to prosecute their claims in this District Court. (Plaintiffs Rosie Brown and Gregory Pickett terminated). Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 4/7/09. Copy mailed to Pickett and Brown as directed. (tgw)
January 23, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Striking Declarations. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 1/23/09. (tgw)
December 10, 2008 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Order DENYING 46 MOTION to Strike Certain Documents. The 52 MOTION to Strike is GRANTED and Exhibit 13 to Defendant's Evidentiary Submission (doc. 48) is stricken. The 52 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART DENIED IN PART as set out. The 41 MOTION Toll Statute of Limitations is DENIED. The 38 MOTION to Certify Class is GRANTED. The Court hereby conditionally certifies an opt-in class as set out. The parties are ordered by 12/30/2008 to submit an agreeable form of notice of opt-in rights for the undersigned's approval. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 12/9/08. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longcrier v. HL-A Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah V. Longcrier
Represented By: Allen D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HL-A Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?