Goldsby v. Renosol Seating, LLC

Plaintiff: Sherry Goldsby
Defendant: Renosol Seating, LLC
Case Number: 2:2008cv00148
Filed: March 18, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2014 178 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/12/2014. (cmj)
December 13, 2013 174 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER approving pending notice of settlement to the Opt-In Plaintiffs re: 172 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement (Second) filed by Sherry Goldsby. Plaintiffs notice of dismissal without prejudice as to the i ndividual defendants Ash, Bernier, Messer, Savage, Brown and Stricklin is MOOT (doc. 168) Parties are to submit by 12/18/13 a draft proposed notice to the Opt-In Plaintiffs with the objection date of 1/24/14. ( Draft proposed notice set for 12/18/2013; objection to notice of settlement set for 1/24/2014.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/13/2013. (cmj)
October 11, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying are denied with leave to re-file by 10/29/13 167 and 169 Motion to Dismiss and Amended Notice of Dismissal; denying with leave to re-file by 10/29/13 170 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement; denying with leave to re-file by 10/29/13 168 Notice of Dismissal as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/11/2013. (cmj)
April 18, 2013 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 154 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting 140 MOTION for Reconsideration of this Court filed by Robert Stricklin, Renosol Seating, LLC, Connie Messer, Ricky Brown, Wayne Savage, Pete Bernier, David Ash. Upon reconsideration of defendants' motion to dismiss (doc. 109), the motion to dismiss is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/18/2013. (cmj)
July 5, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for Plaintiffs to file their amended complaint by 7/13/2012. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/5/2012. (sdb)
May 14, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 102 Motion to Lift Stay. This action is reinstated to the active docket and referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine Nelson for entry of a scheduling order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/11/2012. (cmj)
April 22, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 79 MOTION for Scheduling Order, with leave to re-file upon obtaining relief from the stay from the Bankruptcy Court. In the event that an order granting relief from the stay is not entered, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report by 6/20/2011. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/21/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 3, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered. Deadline set for 3/17/2009 for plaintiffs to mail referenced documents to all potential opt-in plaintiffs. Deadline set for 4/17/2009 for potential opt-in plaintiffs to file their written consents to join litigation. Revised Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2009., Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2009 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 3/2/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldsby v. Renosol Seating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Goldsby
Represented By: Roman Ashley Shaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renosol Seating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?