Davis v. City of Marion

Plaintiff: Cynthia Y. Davis
Defendant: City of Marion
Case Number: 2:2008cv00436
Filed: July 25, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 42:2003 Job Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/4/09. (cmj)
March 16, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 21 MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Order Motion To Reconsider Order Granting Motion to Compel, Additionally, Motion to Request Additional Time To Respond filed by City of Marion, ( Defendant to answer and/or produce or state why it cannot answer a particular request by 5:00 3/20/2009. Motion deadline reset to 4/20/2009., Settlement Position due by 3/30/2009.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 3/16/09. (cmj)
February 18, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Compel Discovery. Defendant to answer and produce as requested on or before 2/27/09. If attorney's fees and costs are claimed, an accounting shall be submitted by affidavit to the Court within ten days of the date of this Order. Any objection to the claimed expenses should be filed with the Court within five days of service of the affidavit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 2/17/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. City of Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Y. Davis
Represented By: Eugene A. Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?