Dees v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Tina Dees
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2008cv00667
Filed: November 14, 2008
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Amended Complaint filed by Tina Dees, recommending that the decision of the Commissioner be AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/28/2010. (cmj)
January 11, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Amended Complaint filed by Tina Dees, recommending that the decision of the Commissioner be AFFIRMED. Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/8/2010. (cmj)
February 3, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 1 Complaint filed by Tina Dees. Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to file an amended complaint that complies with Rule 8(a) as set out. ( Amended complaint deadline set for 2/16/2009.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/2/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dees v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Dees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?