Hancock v. Hood et al

Plaintiff: David Hancock
Defendant: James Hood, Tommy Buford, LCS, Inc. and Brian S. Claytor
Case Number: 2:2009cv00026
Filed: January 15, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Perry
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered that this action is dismissed in its entirety as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/18/2010. (cmj)
January 25, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 39 MOTION to Dismiss by James Hood be granted; 60 MOTION to Dismiss by Tommy Buford be granted; and 34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brian S. Claytor be granted but that Dr. Claytor's alternative motion to transfer be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/25/2010. (cmj)
January 21, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Hancock. Plaintiff to supplement his motion as set out. ( Miscellaneous/supplement deadline set for 2/2/2009.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 1/21/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock v. Hood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hancock
Represented By: Bruce Boynton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Buford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian S. Claytor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?