Green v. Price et al

Petitioner: Michael J. Green
Respondent: Cheryl Price and Troy King
Case Number: 2:2009cv00105
Filed: March 2, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 64 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael J. Green. The petition is denied. The Court finds there is no basis for issuance of a certificate of appealability or for permission to appeal. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/11/2013. (copy mailed) (cmj)
May 25, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. re 27 to Deny MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Michael J. Green, Objections to R&R due by 4/19/2010, 32 MOOTING 2ND MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Michael J. Green. (SEE DOC. 27 ON 4/1/10), DENIED 27 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Michael J. Green signed by Judge Kristi DuBose. (Copy mailed to Appellant, e-mailed to USCA) 32 2ND MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Michael J. Green. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (SEE DOC. 27 ON 4/1/10) (jal) filed by Michael J. Green, 27 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Michael J. Green. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (jal) filed by Michael J. Green, 28 . Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/25/10. (jal)
March 15, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael J. Green, recommending that the petition be dismissed as time barred. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/12/2010. (copy to petitioner) (cmj)
February 26, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael J. Green, recommending that the petition be dismissed as time barred. Objections to R&R due by 3/18/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/25/2010. (copy to petitioner) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Price et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael J. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cheryl Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?