Olds v. Retirement Plan of International Paper

Plaintiff: Herman Olds
Defendant: Retirement Plan of International Paper
Case Number: 2:2009cv00192
Filed: April 7, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion for Attorney Fees. The plaintiff is awarded the sum of $24,074.70. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/1/2011. (tgw)
February 25, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT stating this cause is REMANDED to the defendant for further proceedings not inconsistent with the Court's order. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/25/2011. Copies to parties. (mpp)
May 11, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 35 MOTION in Limine filed by Retirement Plan of International Paper. The bench trial set for May 24, 2010 is cancelled. Plaintiff is ordered to file a Brief by 6/1/2010, Defendant's Response is due by 6/15/2010, & Replies due by 6/29/2010. The Defendant is ordered to file the administrative record by 5/18/2010. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/11/10. (tgw)
March 30, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/30/10. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olds v. Retirement Plan of International Paper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Olds
Represented By: Danny West Crenshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retirement Plan of International Paper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?