Parke v. Glover

Plaintiff: Charles Rodney Parke
Defendant: Ed Glover
Case Number: 2:2009cv00327
Filed: June 9, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice the 38 Motion to Reinstate Case for Settlement Purposes. However, the deadline for any party to move for reinstatement of this action is extended through and including June 14, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/19/10. (tgw)
January 26, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING the 30 Motion for Protective Order. Defendants' objections to the third party subpoenas are OVERRULED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/26/10. (tgw)
November 18, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 21 MOTION Motion for Leave to Join as a Counter-Plaintiff and to File Counterclaim filed by Edward Glover. Glover is ordered by 11/25/2009 to file his Counterclaims as a freestanding document. Parke and Parke Properties must answer those Counterclaims by 12/9/2009. The 19 MOTION to Amend Answer is moot.. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 11/18/09. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parke v. Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rodney Parke
Represented By: Thomas W. H. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Glover
Represented By: J. Wesley Kelly, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?