Doe v. Demopolis, City of et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Demopolis, City of and Terrance Smith
Case Number: 2:2009cv00329
Filed: June 10, 2009
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part 75 MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Ronald Clayton filed by City of Demopolis. The 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Demopolis is granted. All claims & causes of actions against the City are dis missed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate the City of Demopolis as a defendant. Any party who contends that this Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining count (Count 3) should file a brief by 7/11/2011. The Pretrial Conference & Jury Selection are continued until further notice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/30/2011. (tgw)
August 2, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 45 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff is ordered by 8/9/2010 to file her Amended Complaint. The 41 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Terrance Smith is moot. Answer to Amended Complaint is due from Terrance Smith on 8/16/2010. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/2/10. (tgw)
July 10, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss - The Motion is DENIED insofar as Smith requests dismissal or abstention pursuant to the Younger doctrine. However, the Motion is GRANTED insofar as Smith requests entry of a stay for prudential reasons in deference to the related criminal proceedings against him. This action is hereby STAYED in its entirety as set out. Smith is ordered to file status reports every 60 days, with the first such report tobe due on or before August 1, 2009. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 7/10/09. Copies to parties. (mpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Demopolis, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Charles Isaac Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demopolis, City of
Represented By: April W. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Smith
Represented By: Randall Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?