Allen v. Gantt et al

Plaintiff: Tamela Allen
Defendant: Donald Gantt and The City of Marion
Case Number: 2:2010cv00474
Filed: August 27, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court Order that Allens claims against Gantt are dismissed without prejudice, as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/28/2011. (cmj)
May 20, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 35 Unopposed MOTION For HIPAA Order by Donald Gantt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/20/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
December 21, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The City of Marion. It is recommended that the motion to dismiss filed by the City of Marion be granted with respect to the claims asserted against it in Counts Three, Four, Six, Seven and Eight but denied as to the claims asserted in Counts One, Two and Five. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/21/10. copies to parties. (sdb)
December 3, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The City of Marion. It is recommended that the motion to dismiss filed by the City of Marion be granted with respect to the claims asserted against it in Counts Three, Four, Six, Seven and Eight but denied as to the claims asserted in Counts One, Two and Five. Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/2/10. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Gantt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamela Allen
Represented By: David R. Arendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Gantt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?