Dixon et al v. City of Selma et al
Plaintiff: E. N. N. and Louis Dixon
Defendant: City of Selma, Jeffery Hardy, Ray Blanks, Frederick Walker and J. Crum
Case Number: 2:2010cv00478
Filed: August 31, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 22 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; adopting Report and Recommendations re 23 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/20/2011. (e-mailed to USCA, copy to Appellant). (jal)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT entered granting summary judgment in favor of Defendants on all claims. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/11/2011. (cmj)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 12 Motion to Amend Complaint and striking the proposed amended complaint as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/11/2011. (cmj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon et al v. City of Selma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. N. N.
Represented By: Norman Hurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Dixon
Represented By: Norman Hurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Selma
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Hardy
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Blanks
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Walker
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Crum
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?