Lewis et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Lula Lewis and Ricky Lewis
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv00718
Filed: December 29, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 Motion for Partial Dismissal. The motion for partial dismissal filed by defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Doc. 3 ) is granted and Counts Three and Four of the Complaint are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/2/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 9, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 9 MOTION to Remand filed by Ricky Lewis is denied and 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Fraudulent Joinder filed by Patrick Craig is granted. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/9/2011. (cmj)
February 15, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 9 MOTION to Remand filed by Ricky Lewis be denied and recommending 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Fraudulent Joinder filed by Patrick Craig be granted. Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/15/2011. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lula Lewis
Represented By: Barry W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Lewis
Represented By: Barry W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Charles Dennis Hughes
Represented By: Bert S. Nettles
Represented By: Maridi L. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?