Miller et al v. Stevens

Plaintiff: Susan Miller and Bill Warren
Defendant: William Michael Stevens
Case Number: 2:2010mc00008
Filed: March 3, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Registration of Foreign Judgment

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO DISTRIBUTE Funds. Granting 111 MOTION to Condemn and Pay Garnishment Funds filed by Bill Warren, Susan Miller. It is ORDERED that the garnished funds deposited with the court by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama are hereby condemned, and the Clerk of Court is directed to disburse funds to counsel for the plaintiffs, Lee R. Benton, as further set out. It is further ORDERED that any future funds received from Garnishee, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, shall be deemed condemned once the funds clear the appropriate banking restrictions, and the Clerk of Court is directed to disburse said funds to plaintiffs' counsel. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/31/2013. copies to parties, copy emailed to finance, and hard copy placed in Finance box. (sdb)
June 30, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Turning Leaf Medical, Inc.'s 39 Motion for reconsideration pursuant to Rule 60(b). Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/30/2011. (mab)
June 6, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: Plfs' 22 Motion for Order Holding Garnishee Turning Leaf Medical, Inc., in Contempt. The court finds that sanctions should be & are IMPOSED against Turning Leaf Medical, Inc. Plfs are awarded attny's fees & expenses as set out . Fees & expenses should be submitted to the court on or before 6/24/2011. A sanction is further imposed against Turning Leaf Medical, Inc. in the amount of $250.00 per day from the date of the docketing of this order until documents are produced as required by the subpoena. Turning Leaf Medical, Inc. is to file a notice with the court when it has complied w/the subpoena. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/6/2011. (tot)
March 23, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING Dft's 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to the extent that the court will give Dft 30 days to find an attny to represent Turning Leaf Medical, Inc. The time to respond to the conditional judgment is STAYED until 4/25/2011. The c onditional judgment will be made absolute unless Turning Leaf Medical, Inc., appears on or before 4/25/11 & files an Answer to the garnishment as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/23/2011. (copies mailed to Dft & Turning Leaf Medical, Inc. on 3/23/11) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Miller
Represented By: Charles Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Warren
Represented By: Charles Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Michael Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?