Gullett v. Goodman et al

Plaintiff: Timothy Dewayne Gullett
Defendant: Roger Goodman, Sgt. Brown, Officer Walter, Officer King and Officer Barlows
Case Number: 2:2011cv00082
Filed: February 16, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/5/2012. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
April 16, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that plaintiff Timothy Gullett's claims against defendants Warden Roger Goodman, Sergeant David Brown, Officer Richard Waugh, Officer King, and Officer Barlows are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/16/2012. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 12, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order construing plaintiff's letters 29 and 30 as a motion to vacate the order and judgment. The order and judgment dismissing this action with prejudice are VACATED. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order and report and recommendation to Gullett at Kilby.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/12/2012. (order and R&R mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
January 3, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re MOTION for Summary Judgment. It is ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against defendants Warden Roger Goodman, Sergeant David Brown, and Officer Richard Waugh are dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Gullett's claims are dismissed because he failed to comply with this Court's orders. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/3/2012. copy mailed to plf. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gullett v. Goodman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Dewayne Gullett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Barlows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?