Pierce v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Kenny Sam Pierce
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2011cv00214
Filed: April 29, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 Recommendation. 26 Petition for Attorney's Fees is GRANTED, & Plf's Attny, Quinn E. Brock, is AWARDED a fee of $14,124.50. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/5/2016. (tot)
April 4, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plf's 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act is GRANTED, & Plf is AWARDED an EAJA fee in the amount of $2,062.50, payable to Plf. No costs are taxed. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/4/2012. (tot)
November 28, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Plf Kenny Sam Pierce & against Dft Michael J. Astrue. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/28/2011. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Sam Pierce
Represented By: Quinn E. Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?