Vasser v. Dallas-Selma CA & CDC Inc

Plaintiff: Larry Donnell Vasser
Defendant: Doni Ingram, Dallas-Selma CA & CDC Inc, Mary Twitty and Marsha Lawrence
Case Number: 2:2011cv00234
Filed: May 9, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/26/2012. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
October 20, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Order directing the Plaintiff to perfect service on the unserved defendants which are Lawrence (and/or the United States), Twitty and Ingram and to provide proof of such service by 12/6/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/20/2011. Copy of order & 3 blank summons mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
October 3, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America & Marsha Lawrence. The plaintiff's Title VII claim is dismissed with prejudice as to the movants. To the extent the motion attacks the plaintiff's negligence a nd wantonness claims, it is denied. Plaintiff is ordered by 10/17/2011 to show cause why his action against Lawrence and/or the United States should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m). The movants' response is due by 10/24/2011. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/3/2011. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasser v. Dallas-Selma CA & CDC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doni Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas-Selma CA & CDC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Twitty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Donnell Vasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?