Morgan v. Bill Vann Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Melvin Morgan and Reuben Morgan
Defendant: American Standard, Inc., Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Bill Vann Company, Inc., Albany International Corporation, Buffalo Pumps Inc., A.W. Chesterton Co., Weyerhaeuser Company, Crane Co., Warren Pumps LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Foster Wheeler Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Flowserve Corporation, General Electric Company, Dana Companies LLC, Motion Industries Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Gorman-Rupp Company, John Crane, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Ratcliff's Hardware, Inc., Schneider Electric USA Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Sepco Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Turner Supply, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Crown Holdings Inc., CBS Corporation and Georgia-Pacific LLC
Not Yet Classified: Mobile Infirmary Association
Not Classified By Court: Michael E. Upchurch
Case Number: 2:2011cv00535
Filed: September 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Selma Office
County: Wilcox
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2014 Filing 441 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DISMISSAL ON APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS ISSUED AS MANDATE of USCA re: #437 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan, Mandate issued 1/24/14 ; USCA Case Number 13-15150-B (jal)
November 15, 2013 Filing 440 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #437 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. USCA Case Number 13-15150-B (jal)
November 8, 2013 Filing 439 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #436 Judgment, #437 Notice of Appeal, Judge Appealed: Judge Steele, Fee Paid: PAID (jal)
November 8, 2013 Filing 438 Appeal Instructions for G. Patterson Keahey, Esq., re: #437 Notice of Appeal, : The Civil Appeal Statement Form is available on the Internet at www.ca11.uscourts.gov. Transcript Information Form to be filed no later than 11/18/2013. (jal)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 437 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #58 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Order on Motion to Expedite Ruling by Magistrate Judge, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,, by Ronald Melvin Morgan. ( Filing fee $455 receipt number 1128-1508418, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Keahey, Grover)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 436 JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Orders entered (Docs. 413-416, 418-423, 435), plaintiff's claims against defendants Albany International Corporation, General Electric Company, Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Crown Holdings Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Flowserve Corporation, Gorman-Rupp Company, Crane Co., Warren Pumps LLC, and CBS Corporation are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's claims against defendant John Crane, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/8/2013. (tgw)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER granting #434 Joint Motion for Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against defendant John Crane, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Because this ruling disposes of all remaining claims and causes of action, the Clerk is directed to terminate John Crane, Inc. as a party defendant and to close this file for administrative and statistical purposes. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/8/2013. (tgw)
October 7, 2013 Filing 434 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice and For Additional Relief by John Crane, Inc., Reuben Morgan. (Lankford, Frank)
October 1, 2013 Filing 433 Witness List by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
October 1, 2013 Filing 432 Exhibit List by Ronald Melvin Morgan.. (Keahey, Grover)
October 1, 2013 Filing 431 Exhibit List by John Crane, Inc... (Lankford, Frank)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motions for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) and Motions for Stay (Docs. #426 , #427 , #428 , #429 ). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/30/2013. (tgw)
September 25, 2013 Filing 429 MOTION Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) Motin for Stay and Memorandum in Support re #423 Order, Add and Terminate Parties, Terminate Motions,,, Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) Motion for Stay and Memorandum in Support by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
September 25, 2013 Filing 428 MOTION Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) Motion for Stay and Memorandum in Support re #422 Order, Add and Terminate Parties, Terminate Motions,,, Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) Motion for Stay and Memorandum in Support by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
September 25, 2013 Filing 427 MOTION Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) Motion for Stay and Memorandum in Support re #414 Order, Add and Terminate Parties, Terminate Motions,,, by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
September 25, 2013 Filing 426 MOTION Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) Motion for Stay and Memorandum in Support re #421 Order, Add and Terminate Parties, Terminate Motions,,, by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER denying #424 Motion to Stay, with leave to renew same if Rule 54(b) certification is granted as to one or more of the summary judgmentorders as to which plaintiff desires an immediate appeal. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/24/2013. (mbp)
September 24, 2013 Filing 424 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Order granting #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CBS Corporation; denying #359 MOTION to Strike filed by CBS Corporation. Plaintiff's claims against CBS Corporation are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate CBS Corporation as a party defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 422 Order granting #267 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps LLC; granting #361 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limitation filed by Warren Pumps LLC. Plaintiff's claims against Warren Pumps LLC are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate Warren Pumps, LLC as a party defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 421 Order granting #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crane Co. Plaintiff's claims against Crane Co. are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate Crane Co. as a party defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 420 Order granting #275 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gorman-Rupp Company. Plaintiff's claims against Gorman-Rupp Company are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate Gorman-Rupp as a party defenant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 419 Order granting #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Flowserve Corporation. Plaintiff's claims against Flowserve Corporation are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Flowserve as a party defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Order granting #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Honeywell International, Inc. Plaintiffs claims against Honeywell are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Honeywell as a party defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER denying #271 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by John Crane. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Order granting #273 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Crown Holdings Inc. Plaintiffs claims against Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc. and Crown Holdings Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Crown Cork & Seal and Crown Holdings as parties defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 415 Order granting #276 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. Plaintiff's claims against Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. as a party defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Order granting #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by General Electric Company. Plaintiff's claims against General Electric Company are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate General Electric Company as a party defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 413 Order granting #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Albany International Corporation. Plaintiff's claims against Albany are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate Albany International Corporation as a party defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER entered that plaintiff's claims against Sepco Corporation be dismissed without prejudice subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated. Sepco's pending Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. #277 ) is moot, and the Clerk is directed to terminate Sepco Corporation as a party defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/20/2013. (tgw)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 411 Order: The Court expects to begin issuing summary judgment rulings during the week of 8/26/2013. If plaintiff and Sepco (or any other defendant) wish to work out a settlement antecedent to those rulings, the time is now. Otherwise, this case will move forward, without further delay. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/19/2013. (tgw)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Order granting #409 MOTION FOR FIRM TRIAL DATE filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. This action is set for trial to commence on 11/12/2013 (jury selection remains set for 11/5/2013). The Court will initially reserve nine days for this trial (through and including 11/22/2013). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/24/2013. (tgw)
June 19, 2013 Filing 409 MOTION FOR FIRM TRIAL DATE by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Keahey, Grover)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 408 Order resetting the Pretrial Conference for 10/15/2013 10:30 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Jury Selection set for 11/5/2013 08:45 AM in Courtroom 2A. Trial to be set during the November 2013 civil term. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/23/2013. (tgw)
May 23, 2013 Filing 407 Response in Opposition to Westinghouse's Motion to Strike and Notice of Objections by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover) Modified on 5/24/2013 (tgw).
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER re: #405 Notice. Defendants Turner Supply Company and Trane US, Inc. f/k/a American Standard, Inc. TERMINATED as directed. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/14/2013. (sdb)
May 13, 2013 Filing 405 NOTICE by American Standard, Inc., Turner Supply, Inc. of Dismissal Orders (Partridge, Donald)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Order directing the plaintiff & defendants Turner Supply and American Standard by 5/17/2013 to file a Joint Status Report reflecting their present understanding as to whether these defendants are or are not still in this case. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/10/2013. (tgw)
May 9, 2013 Filing 403 REPLY to Response to Motion #359 filed by CBS Corporation. (Harris, James)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER: Based on the Supplemental Report of the Mediator (Doc. 401), it is ordered that plaintiff's claims against defendant Foster Wheeler Corporation be dismissed with prejudice, provided that any party may move to reinstate those claims within 30 days if the settlement agreement or other appropriate settlement documentation is not consummated. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Foster Wheeler Corporation as a party defendant. The Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 260) filed by Foster Wheeler is moot. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/7/2013. (tgw)
May 6, 2013 Filing 401 Position Regarding Mediation Second Supplemental Report of Mediator filed by Michael E. Upchurch. (Upchurch, Michael)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER: Based on the Supplemental Report of the Mediator (Doc. #399 ), it is ordered that plaintiff's claims against defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc. be dismissed with prejudice, provided that any party may move to reinstate those claims within 30 days if the settlement agreement or other appropriate settlement documentation is not consummated. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Goulds Pumps, Inc. as a party defendant. The Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 261) filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc. is moot. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/3/2013. (tgw)
May 3, 2013 Filing 399 Position Regarding Mediation Supplemental Report of Mediator filed by Michael E. Upchurch. (Upchurch, Michael)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER: Based on the Mediator's Report of a partial settlement (Doc. #396 ), it is ordered that plaintiff's claims against defendant A.W. Chesterton Co. be dismissed with prejudice, provided that any party may move to reinstate those claims within 30 days if the settlement agreement or other appropriate settlement documentation is not consummated. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate A.W. Chesterton Co. as a party defendant. The Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 278) filed by A.W. Chesterton Co. is moot. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/1/2013. (tgw)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ENDORSED ORDER Granting [Doc. 394] Motion for Attorney Daniel R. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/1/2013. (kpt)
May 1, 2013 Filing 396 Position Regarding Mediation Mediator's Report filed by Michael E. Upchurch. (Upchurch, Michael)
May 1, 2013 Filing 395 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits in support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Griffin by John Crane, Inc. filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Griffin, Daniel)
April 30, 2013 Filing 394 MOTION for Daniel R. Griffin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1423550, Online Credit Card Payment.) by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission to Practice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Griffin, Daniel)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER denying without prejudice #392 Motion for Firm Trial Date. After mediation concludes, they may renew their motion upon identification of appropriate, mutually agreeable and available dates during the August trial term. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/18/2013. (tgw)
April 17, 2013 Filing 392 Joint MOTION to Reschedule to Firm Trial Date by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER granting #390 Motion for Extension of Time. Mediation shall be conducted on 4/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 3/22/2013. (tgw)
March 21, 2013 Filing 390 MOTION for Extension of Time by Crane Co., Foster Wheeler Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Redditt, F.)
March 21, 2013 Filing 389 Position Regarding Mediation Preliminary Report of Mediator filed by Michael E. Upchurch. (Upchurch, Michael)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 388 Order granting in part denying in part #387 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation, Crane Co., Goulds Pumps, Inc. Mediation is to be completed by 4/19/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 3/18/2013. (tgw)
March 15, 2013 Filing 387 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by Crane Co., Foster Wheeler Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Redditt, F.)
March 11, 2013 Filing 386 ANSWER to #374 Amended Complaint by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Crown Holdings Inc.. (Gilmer, Walter)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Order granting in part #384 Joint MOTION to Continue filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation, Crane Co., Goulds Pumps, Inc. Pretrial Conference is reset for 7/9/2013 02:00 PM in Chambers before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Jury Selection is reset for 8/6/2013 08:45 AM. Trial is reset for the August 2013 term of court. To the extent the parties seek further relief, including a November 2013 trial setting, their motion isdenied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/11/2013. (tgw)
March 6, 2013 Filing 384 Joint MOTION to Continue by Crane Co., Foster Wheeler Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Redditt, F.)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER terminating #381 Motion to Dismiss. The Court construes the #381 Joint Motion as a motion to alter or amend pursuant to Rule 59(e) or 60(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the construed motion to amend is granted. The March 1 Order (doc. #380 ) is hereby amended to reflect that all of plaintiff's claims asserted against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his or its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/4/2013. (sdb)
March 1, 2013 Filing 382 RESPONSE in Opposition re #359 MOTION to Strike #323 Response, filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
March 1, 2013 Filing 381 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss Metropolitan Life Insurance Company WITH Prejudice by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Order granting in part #378 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Georgia Pacific & #379 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Met Life and Dana Companies filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. Plaintiff's claims against Georgia-Pacific LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company are dismissed without prejudice. The motion as to Dana Companies, LLC is moot as they were previously dismissed (see Order, Doc. #366 ). Georgia-Pacific LLC and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company terminated as defendants. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/1/2013. (tgw)
February 28, 2013 Filing 379 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Met Life and Dana Companies by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
February 28, 2013 Filing 378 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Georgia Pacific by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
February 22, 2013 Filing 377 Joinder in MOTION re #359 MOTION to Strike #323 Response, . (McDonough, Edward)
February 22, 2013 Filing 376 Joinder in MOTION re #359 MOTION to Strike #323 Response, . (McDonough, Edward)
February 22, 2013 Filing 375 Joinder in MOTION re #359 MOTION to Strike #323 Response, . (Redditt, F.)
February 22, 2013 Filing 374 AMENDED COMPLAINT THIRD to include count of wrongful death against All Defendants, filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Order STRIKING the #370 Third Amended Complaint filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. Plaintiff is ordered by 2/25/2013 to correct and refile the Third Amended Complaint (as set out). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/22/2013. (tgw)
February 22, 2013 Filing 372 Second Joinder in MOTION re #359 MOTION to Strike #323 Response, . (Pflaum, Keith)
February 22, 2013 Filing 371 Notice of Joinder by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Gorman-Rupp Company, Honeywell International, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Sepco Corporation re: #359 MOTION to Strike #323 Response, (Lankford, Frank)
February 22, 2013 Filing 370 (Stricken per #373 Order) AMENDED COMPLAINT THIRD to add claim for wrongful death against All Defendants, filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Order granting #331 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. Plaintiff is ordered to file the Third Amended Complaint by 2/25/2013. All defendants are relieved of the obligation to file responsive pleadings to the Third Amended Complaint. However, any defendant that wishes to assert any new affirmative defenses or to set forth particular admissions or denials to aspects of the new wrongful death claim must file an answer by 3/11/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/21/2013. (tgw)
February 21, 2013 Filing 368 Joinder in MOTION re #359 MOTION to Strike #323 Response, . (House, James)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation, as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/20/2013. (tgw)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Order granting #330 MOTION to Dismiss Bill Vann Company, Inc. Without Prejudice filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan, #332 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Dana Companies LLC. All of plaintiff's claims asserted against defendant Bill Vann Company are dismissed without prejudice. Likewise, all of plaintiffs claims against Dana Companies, LLC, f/k/a Dana Corporation, are dismissed with prejudice. (Bill Vann Company, Inc. and Dana Companies LLC terminated as defendants.). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/20/2013. (tgw)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 365 Order re: #351 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Motion Industries Inc. The stipulation is construed as a Motion for Pro Tanto Dismissal and is granted. All of plaintiff's claims asserted against defendant Motion Industries, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Motion Industries Inc. terminated as a party defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/19/2013. (tgw)
February 19, 2013 Filing 364 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant A.W. Chesterton Co. re: #311 Response, filed by A.W. Chesterton Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (McDonough, Edward)
February 19, 2013 Filing 363 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Flowserve Corporation re: #312 Response, filed by Flowserve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (McDonough, Edward)
February 19, 2013 Filing 362 REPLY to Response to Motion #267 filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Mills, William)
February 19, 2013 Filing 361 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limitation by Warren Pumps LLC. (Mills, William)
February 19, 2013 Filing 360 REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Crown Holdings Inc. re: #322 Response, #273 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Crown Holdings Inc.. (McClurkin, Anne)
February 19, 2013 Filing 359 MOTION to Strike #323 Response, by CBS Corporation. (Harris, James)
February 19, 2013 Filing 358 REPLY to #324 MOTION Enlarge Page Limit re #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment Crane Co.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Response In Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Redditt, F.)
February 19, 2013 Filing 357 Evidentiary Material in Support of Reply filed by General Electric Company re: #356 Reply to Response to Motion. (House, James)
February 19, 2013 Filing 356 REPLY to Response to Motion #262 filed by General Electric Company. (House, James)
February 19, 2013 Filing 355 REPLY to Response to Motion #266 filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J, #6 Exhibit K) (Harris, James)
February 19, 2013 Filing 354 REPLY to #321 Response,,, Concerning Statute of Limitations filed by Albany International Corporation, CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Crown Holdings Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Gorman-Rupp Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Sepco Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC. (Lankford, Frank)
February 19, 2013 Filing 353 REPLY to Response to Motion #271 filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Lankford, Frank)
February 19, 2013 Filing 352 REPLY to Response to Motion #277 filed by Sepco Corporation. (Lankford, Frank)
February 19, 2013 Filing 351 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Motion Industries Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Northcutt, Robert)
February 19, 2013 Filing 350 REPLY to Response to Motion #276 filed by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Lankford, Frank)
February 19, 2013 Filing 349 REPLY to Response to Motion #269 filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Lankford, Frank)
February 19, 2013 Filing 348 REPLY to Response to Motion #276 filed by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Lankford, Frank) (Corrected pleading refiled at Doc. #350 )
February 19, 2013 Filing 347 REPLY to Response to Motion #275 filed by Gorman-Rupp Company. (Lankford, Frank)
February 19, 2013 Filing 346 REPLY to #318 MOTION Enlarge Page Limit re #261 MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply to Plaintiff's Response In Opposition to MSJ filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Clarke, Timothy)
February 19, 2013 Filing 345 REPLY to #320 MOTION Enlarge Page Limit re #260 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Redditt, F.)
February 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Order re: #342 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Buffalo Pumps Inc. & #343 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Schneider Electric USA Inc. The construed Motions for Pro Tanto Dismissal are granted. All of plaintiff's claims asserted against defendants Buffalo Pumps, Inc. and Schneider Electric USA, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. (Buffalo Pumps Inc. and Schneider Electric USA Inc. terminated). Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/18/2013 (tgw)
February 15, 2013 Filing 343 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Schneider Electric USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (McDonough, Edward)
February 15, 2013 Filing 342 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Buffalo Pumps Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McDonough, Edward)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting #339 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by CBS Corporation. CBS is authorized to file a reply brief of up to 20 pages. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/15/2013. (tgw)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Order re: #337 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiff. In light of this filing, the #265 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Buffalo Pumps Inc. & #268 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Schneider Electric USA Inc. are deemed MOOT. Rule 41(a)(2) motions for dismissal of defendants Met Life, Buffalo Pumps, Schneider Electric and Georgia-Pacific should be filed by 3/1/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/15/2013. (tgw)
February 14, 2013 Filing 339 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by CBS Corporation. (Harris, James)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER re: #336 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Final Summary Judgment filed by Georgia-Pacific LLC. In light of this filing, the #274 Motion for Summary Judgment is deemed MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/14/2013. (tgw)
February 14, 2013 Filing 337 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #325 Order to Show Cause filed by Reuben Morgan, Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
February 13, 2013 Filing 336 NOTICE by Georgia-Pacific LLC of its Withdrawal of Motion for Final Summary Judgment (Wheeler, Allan)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Order re: #332 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Dana Companies LLC. Responses due by 2/19/2013. In light of this filing, the #259 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dana Companies LLC is moot. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/13/2013. (tgw)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Order re: #330 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. Responses due by 2/19/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/13/2013. (tgw)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Order re: #331 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. Responses due by 2/20/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/13/2013. (tgw)
February 11, 2013 Filing 332 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Dana Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Evelyn)
February 8, 2013 Filing 331 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Third Amended Complaint) (Keahey, Grover)
February 8, 2013 Filing 330 MOTION to Dismiss by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER re: #328 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. In light of this filing, the #246 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby deemed as MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/8/2013. (tgw)
February 8, 2013 Filing 328 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #246 MOTION for Summary Judgment Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment (Vercher, Michael)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Order entered that Telephone Conference set for 2/20/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Counsel for all parties are expected to participate and may access the conference by using the information provided in order;. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/7/2013. (mjn)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting Motions for leave of Court to exceed the 30-page briefing limitation (Docs. #317 , #318 , #320 , #324 ). The proposed response briefs appended to each such Motion are accepted in their current configurations. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/6/2013. (tgw)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing the plaintiff by 2/14/2013 to show cause why the five unresponded-to motions for summary judgment should not be summarily granted. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/6/2013. (tgw)
February 4, 2013 Filing 324 MOTION Enlarge Page Limit re #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 323 RESPONSE to #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 322 RESPONSE to #273 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 321 RESPONSE to #276 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #275 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #260 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #273 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #267 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #261 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #278 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 320 MOTION Enlarge Page Limit re #260 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 319 RESPONSE to #276 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 318 MOTION Enlarge Page Limit re #261 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 317 MOTION ENLARGE PAGE LIMIT re #267 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 A, #3 B, #4 C, #5 D, #6 E, #7 F, #8 G, #9 H, #10 I, #11 J, #12 K) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 316 RESPONSE to #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 315 RESPONSE to #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 314 RESPONSE to #275 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 313 RESPONSE to #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 312 RESPONSE to #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 311 RESPONSE to #278 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Keahey, Grover)
February 4, 2013 Filing 310 RESPONSE to #269 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Keahey, Grover)
February 1, 2013 Filing 309 Position Regarding Settlement filed by CBS Corporation. (Harris, James)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Order: The #304 Stipulation of Dismissal, construed as a Motion for Pro Tanto Dismissal, is granted. All of plaintiff's claims asserted against defendant Union Carbide Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. Union Carbide Corporation is terminated as a party defendant and the #251 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Union Carbide Corporation is moot. This action shall proceed with respect to plaintiffs claims against all remaining defendants. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/30/2013. Copy mailed to Bruce Bishop. (tgw)
January 30, 2013 Filing 307 NOTICE by Ronald Melvin Morgan re #281 Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Notice of Deposition of Tom McCaffery (Keahey, Grover)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Order: The #295 Stipulation of Dismissal, construed as a Motion for Pro Tanto Dismissal is granted. All of plaintiff's claims asserted against defendant Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. This action shall proceed with respect to plaintiff's claims against all remaining defendants. Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. terminated as a party defendant.. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/30/2013. Copy mailed to Bruce Bishop. (tgw)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ENDORSED ORDER Granting [Doc. 303] Defendant General Electric's Motion to Withdraw as counsel the Balch & Bingham law firm and attorneys Jenelle R. Evans and S. Allen Baker, Jr. and substitute as counsel attorneys James G. House, III and Donald C. Partridge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/30/2013. (kpt)
January 29, 2013 Filing 304 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Union Carbide Corporation. (Earnhardt, John)
January 29, 2013 Filing 303 MOTION for Balch & Bingham, LLP to Withdraw as Attorney , MOTION to Substitute Attorney Forman Perry Watkins Krutz & Tardy LLP by General Electric Company. (House, James)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER granting #299 Motion to Substitute Party. Ronald Melvin Morgan, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Rueben Morgan is hereby substituted for Rueben Morgan as plaintiff in this action for all purposes. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/29/2013. Copy mailed to Bruce T. Bishop. (tgw)
January 25, 2013 Filing 301 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Ronald Melvin Morgan re: #299 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff (Keahey, Grover)
January 25, 2013 Filing 300 NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. of Filing Supplemental Expert Disclosure (Lankford, Frank)
January 25, 2013 Filing 299 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff by Ronald Melvin Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Death, #2 Exhibit Letters of Administration) (Keahey, Grover)
January 23, 2013 Filing 298 NOTICE by Reuben Morgan re #292 Notice (Other) Withdrawal of Notice of Deposition of Victor L. Roggli, M.D. (Keahey, Grover)
January 23, 2013 Filing 297 Attorney Letter re: ECF Registration mailed to Bruce T. Bishop; Attorney to comply within 7 days. (tgw)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Order re: #295 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Reuben Morgan and Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. The Joint Stipulation will be construed as a motion. Response to Motion due by 1/29/2013. In light of this filing, Saint-Gobains pending Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. #247 ) is moot. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/23/2013. Copy mailed to Bruce T. Bishop. (tgw)
January 22, 2013 Filing 295 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc.. (Sprain, Robert)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ENDORSED ORDER Granting [Doc. 291] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Bruce T. Bishop. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/16/2013. (kpt)
January 15, 2013 Filing 293 NOTICE by Georgia-Pacific LLC of filing Amended Exhibit B to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bruce T. Bishop (Wheeler, Allan)
January 15, 2013 Filing 292 NOTICE by Reuben Morgan of Deposition of Victor L. Roggli, M.D. (Keahey, Grover)
January 14, 2013 Filing 291 MOTION for Bruce T. Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1379169, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Wheeler, Allan)
January 14, 2013 Filing 290 Notice of Filing Amended Notice of Telephonic Continuation Deposition Duces Tecum of Richard L. Kradin, M.D. filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Redditt, F.)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time #280 . The deadline for the parties' Joint Statement Regarding Settlement Positions is EXTENDED to February 1, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/10/2013. (Bivins, Sonja)
January 8, 2013 Filing 288 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Crane Co. re: #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redditt, F.)
January 8, 2013 Filing 287 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Foster Wheeler Corporation re: #260 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redditt, F.)
January 8, 2013 Filing 286 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Goulds Pumps, Inc. re: #261 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Clarke, Timothy)
January 8, 2013 Filing 285 Determinations of Undisputed Fact re: #261 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Goulds Pumps, Inc. filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Clarke, Timothy)
January 8, 2013 Filing 284 Determinations of Undisputed Fact re: #260 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Foster Wheeler Corporation filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Redditt, F.)
January 8, 2013 Filing 283 Determinations of Undisputed Fact re: #270 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Crane Co. filed by Crane Co.. (Redditt, F.)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER re: #244 Stipulation of Dismissal. The stipulation, construed as a Motion for Pro Tanto Dismissal, is granted. All of plaintiff's claims asserted against defendant Eaton Corporation are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his or its own costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Eaton as a defendant. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/8/2013. (tgw)
January 8, 2013 Filing 281 Notice of Filing Notice of Taking T. McCaffrey's Deposition filed by Reuben Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
January 8, 2013 Filing 280 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Settlement Conference by Reuben Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Order on the Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 259-262, 265-278) setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 2/4/2013. Replies to Response to S/J due by 2/19/2013. The motions will be taken under submission on 2/19/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/8/2013. (tgw)
January 7, 2013 Filing 278 MOTION for Summary Judgment by A.W. Chesterton Co.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Determination of Undisputed Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Text of Proposed Order) (McDonough, Edward)
January 7, 2013 Filing 277 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sepco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Brief, #2 Exhibit A-C, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Lankford, Frank)
January 7, 2013 Filing 276 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A-C, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Lankford, Frank)
January 7, 2013 Filing 275 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gorman-Rupp Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Lankford, Frank)
January 7, 2013 Filing 274 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit A to Brief, #3 Exhibit B to Brief, #4 Exhibit C to Brief, #5 Supplement Suggested Determinations of Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law, #6 Text of Proposed Order) (Wheeler, Allan)
January 7, 2013 Filing 273 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Crown Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Suggested Findings of Undisputed Fact and Conclusions of Law, #6 Exhibit Proposed Order) (McClurkin, Anne)
January 7, 2013 Filing 272 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Flowserve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts and Memo of Law, #2 Determination of Undisputed Facts and Memo of Law, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Errata F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Text of Proposed Order) (McDonough, Edward)
January 7, 2013 Filing 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Lankford, Frank)
January 7, 2013 Filing 270 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Redditt, F.)
January 7, 2013 Filing 269 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lankford, Frank)
January 7, 2013 Filing 268 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Schneider Electric USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts and Memo of Law, #2 Determination of Undisouted Facts and Memo of Law, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Text of Proposed Order) (McDonough, Edward)
January 7, 2013 Filing 267 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Warren Pumps, LLCs Memorandum Brief in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit #1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit #2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit #3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit #4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit #5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit #6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit #7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit #8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit #9, #11 Exhibit Defendant Warren Pumps, LLCs Determinations of Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law, #12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Judgment) (Mills, William)
January 7, 2013 Filing 266 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Harris, James)
January 7, 2013 Filing 265 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Buffalo Pumps Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts and Memo of Law, #2 Determinations of Undisputed Facts and Memo of Law, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Text of Proposed Order) (McDonough, Edward)
January 7, 2013 Filing 264 Evidentiary Material in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by General Electric Company re: #263 Brief. (Evans, Jenelle)
January 7, 2013 Filing 263 Brief filed by General Electric Company re #262 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Evans, Jenelle)
January 7, 2013 Filing 262 MOTION for Summary Judgment by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Evans, Jenelle)
January 7, 2013 Filing 261 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Clarke, Timothy)
January 7, 2013 Filing 260 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief in Support of MSJ, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (Redditt, F.)
January 7, 2013 Filing 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum Brief in Support by Dana Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-I, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Judgment) (Davis, Evelyn)
January 4, 2013 Filing 258 NOTICE by Flowserve Corporation Amended Notice of Service of Expert Report (McDonough, Edward)
January 4, 2013 Filing 257 NOTICE by Buffalo Pumps Inc. Amended Notice of Service of Expert Report (McDonough, Edward)
January 4, 2013 Filing 256 NOTICE by Foster Wheeler Corporation of filing Revised Notice of Telephonic Deposition Duces Tecum of Richard L. Kradin, M.D. (Redditt, F.)
January 4, 2013 Filing 255 NOTICE by Schneider Electric USA Inc. of Amended Notice of Service of Expert Report (McDonough, Edward)
January 4, 2013 Filing 254 Notice of Filing Expert Report of Victor L. Roggli, M.D. filed by Crane Co., Foster Wheeler Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Redditt, F.)
January 4, 2013 Filing 253 NOTICE by Georgia-Pacific LLC of Amended Notice of Service of Expert Disclosures (Wheeler, Allan)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Order on the #251 MOTION for Summary Judgment setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 1/31/2013. Replies to Response to S/J due by 2/14/2013. The motion will be taken under submission on 2/14/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/4/2013. (tgw)
January 3, 2013 Filing 251 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Supplement Determination of Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law, #25 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Judgment) (Earnhardt, John)
January 3, 2013 Filing 250 NOTICE by Warren Pumps LLC of Filing Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C) (Mills, William)
January 3, 2013 Filing 249 NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation of Service of Expert Submission (Earnhardt, John)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Order on the #246 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #247 MOTION for Summary Judgment setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 1/28/2013. Replies to Response to S/J due by 2/11/2013. The motions will be taken under submission on 2/11/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/2/2013. (tgw)
December 31, 2012 Filing 247 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Supplement State of Determinations of Fact, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E) (Sprain, Robert)
December 31, 2012 Filing 246 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Undisputed Fact, #2 Supplement Memo in Support of MSJ, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13) (Vercher, Michael)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Order re: #244 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Eaton Corporation. Any party wishing to be heard on this Motion must file aresponse, supported by legal authority as appropriate, on or before 1/4/13. If none ofthe remaining defendants submit an opposition brief by that date, the Court will assume that theMotion is unopposed and will promptly enter an order dismissing plaintiffs claims against Eatonwith prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. The motion for summary judgment #205 is moot and the briefing schedule is of no further force or effect. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/28/2012. (mbp)
December 27, 2012 Filing 244 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smyth, John)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #214 Motion for Extension of Time; granting in part and denying in part #227 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Expert Disclosure deadline extended to 1/4/13. Motions for Summary Judgment deadline extended to 1/7/13. ( Motions due by 1/7/2013.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/21/2012. (cmj)
December 21, 2012 Filing 242 NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation of Service of Expert Submissions (Earnhardt, John)
December 21, 2012 Filing 241 NOTICE by John Crane, Inc. of Filing Expert Disclosures (Lankford, Frank)
December 21, 2012 Filing 240 NOTICE by Georgia-Pacific LLC of Service of Expert Disclosure (Wheeler, Allan)
December 21, 2012 Filing 239 NOTICE by Schneider Electric USA Inc. Notice of Filing Expert Reports (McDonough, Edward)
December 21, 2012 Filing 238 NOTICE by Motion Industries Inc. of Filing Expert Disclosures (Northcutt, Robert)
December 21, 2012 Filing 237 NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. of Filing Expert Disclosures (Lankford, Frank)
December 21, 2012 Filing 236 Notice of Filing Disclosure of Expert Testimony filed by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Crown Holdings Inc.. (Gilmer, Walter)
December 21, 2012 Filing 235 NOTICE by Sepco Corporation of Filing Expert Disclosures (Lankford, Frank)
December 21, 2012 Filing 234 NOTICE by Gorman-Rupp Company of Filing Expert Disclosures (Lankford, Frank)
December 21, 2012 Filing 233 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of Service of Witness List and Expert Disclosure (Vercher, Michael)
December 21, 2012 Filing 232 NOTICE by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. of Expert Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Thomas Service Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Service curriculum vitae, #3 Exhibit C - Dr. Roggli report) (Sprain, Robert)
December 21, 2012 Filing 231 NOTICE by CBS Corporation of Service of Expert Reports (Harris, James)
December 21, 2012 Filing 230 NOTICE by Flowserve Corporation Notice of Service of Expert Reports (McDonough, Edward)
December 21, 2012 Filing 229 NOTICE by Buffalo Pumps Inc. Notice of Service of Expert Reports (McDonough, Edward)
December 21, 2012 Filing 228 NOTICE by General Electric Company Notice of Service of Expert Reports (Evans, Jenelle)
December 21, 2012 Filing 227 MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadline by Warren Pumps LLC. (Mills, William)
December 21, 2012 Filing 226 NOTICE by Albany International Corporation Expert Disclosure (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Pflaum, Keith)
December 21, 2012 Filing 225 NOTICE by Warren Pumps LLC of Filing Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Mills, William)
December 21, 2012 Filing 224 NOTICE by Goulds Pumps, Inc. Notice of Filing Expert Report (Clarke, Timothy)
December 21, 2012 Filing 223 NOTICE by Foster Wheeler Corporation Notice of Filing Expert Report (Redditt, F.)
December 21, 2012 Filing 222 NOTICE by Crane Co. Notice of Filing Expert Report (Redditt, F.)
December 21, 2012 Filing 221 NOTICE by Dana Companies LLC of Filing Expert Report (Davis, Evelyn)
December 20, 2012 Filing 220 Joinder in MOTION re #214 MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines of Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Wheeler, Allan)
December 20, 2012 Filing 219 Joinder in MOTION for Extension of Time Joinder by Union Carbide Corporation. (McCormick, Gregg) Modified on 12/21/2012 (tgw).
December 20, 2012 Filing 218 Joinder in MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadline by Crane Co., Foster Wheeler Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Redditt, F.) Modified on 12/21/2012 (tgw).
December 20, 2012 Filing 217 Joinder in MOTION for Extension of Time Joinder by CBS Corporation. (Harris, James) Modified on 12/21/2012 (tgw).
December 20, 2012 Filing 216 Joinder in MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Warren Pumps LLC. (Mills, William) Modified on 12/21/2012 (tgw).
December 20, 2012 Filing 215 Joinder in MOTION for Extension of Time Joinder by General Electric Company. (Evans, Jenelle) Modified on 12/21/2012 (tgw).
December 20, 2012 Filing 214 MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Buffalo Pumps Inc., Flowserve Corporation, Schneider Electric USA Inc.. (McDonough, Edward)
December 14, 2012 Filing 213 NOTICE by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. of Filing Expert Disclosures (Lankford, Frank)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ENDORSED ORDER granting parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time #211 . The deadline for the parties' joint statement regarding settlement positions is EXTENDED to January 14, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/11/2012. (Bivins, Sonja)
December 10, 2012 Filing 211 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Settlement Conference by Reuben Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
December 10, 2012 Filing 210 Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Supplemental Disclosure filed by Reuben Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
December 7, 2012 Filing 209 REPLY to Response to Motion #195 for Summary Judgment filed by Motion Industries Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Northcutt, Robert)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Order on the #205 MOTION for Summary Judgment setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 12/28/2012. Replies to Response to S/J due by 1/11/2013. The motion will be taken under submission on 1/11/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/5/2012. (tgw)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Order re: #206 Suggestion of Death filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation, Crane Co., Bill Vann Company, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc. The Court is unaware of any reason why this litigation cannot move forward at this time. All pending deadlines remain in full force and effect. To the extent that any party requires relief from such deadlines as an accommodation for these recent developments, that party must promptly file an appropriate motion. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/4/2012. (tgw)
December 4, 2012 Filing 206 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff, Rueben Morgan by Foster Wheeler Corporation, Crane Co., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Bill Vann Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Redditt, F.)
November 30, 2012 Filing 205 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eaton Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandium Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Supplement Determinations of Undisputed Fact and Conclusions of Law, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Smyth, John)
November 26, 2012 Filing 204 RESPONSE in Opposition re #195 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendant Motion Industries, Inc. filed by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E) (Keahey, Grover)
November 19, 2012 Filing 203 Notice of Filing Notice of Deposition of Richard L. Kradin, M.D. filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Redditt, F.)
November 15, 2012 Filing 202 REPLY to Response to Motion #193 filed by Albany International Corporation. (Pflaum, Keith)
November 9, 2012 Filing 201 Notice of Filing Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures filed by Reuben Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
November 9, 2012 Filing 200 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing of Expert Reports filed by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Keahey, Grover)
November 1, 2012 Filing 199 RESPONSE in Opposition re #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Keahey, Grover)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Order on re #195 MOTION for Summary Judgment setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 11/26/2012. Replies to Response to S/J due by 12/10/2012. The motion will be taken under submission on 12/10/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/29/2012. (tgw)
October 29, 2012 Filing 197 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Motion Industries Inc. re: #195 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #196 Determinations of Undisputed Fact (Northcutt, Robert)
October 29, 2012 Filing 196 Determinations of Undisputed Fact re: #195 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Motion Industries Inc. filed by Motion Industries Inc.. (Northcutt, Robert)
October 29, 2012 Filing 195 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Motion Industries Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Northcutt, Robert)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Order on the #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 11/1/2012. Replies to Response to S/J due by 11/15/2012. The motion will be taken under submission on 11/15/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/5/2012. Copy mailed to attorneys Pfahl & Durham. (tgw)
October 4, 2012 Filing 193 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Albany International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support of MSJ, #2 Supplement Determinations of Undisputed Fact, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order) (Pflaum, Keith)
October 3, 2012 Filing 192 Attorney Letter regarding ECF Registration mailed to Scott Bolman Pfahl; Attorney to comply within 7 days. (tgw)
October 3, 2012 Filing 191 Attorney Letter regarding ECF Registration mailed to William L. Durham, II; Attorney to comply within 7 days. (tgw)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #189 Motion for Extension of Expert Disclosure Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/2/2012. Copy mailed to attorneys Pfahl & Durham. (tgw)
October 1, 2012 Filing 189 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Expert Disclosure Deadlines) by Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Redditt, F.)
September 24, 2012 Filing 188 Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Objections to Deposition of Gerald Markowitz, Ph.D. filed by Reuben Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ENDORSED ORDER Granting [Doc. 185] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Scott B. Pfahl, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/18/2012. (kpt)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ENDORSED ORDER Granting [Doc. 184] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by William L. Durham II, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/18/2012. (kpt)
September 18, 2012 Filing 185 MOTION for Scott B. Pfahl to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1329762, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Wheeler, Allan)
September 18, 2012 Filing 184 MOTION for William L. Durham II to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1329740, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Wheeler, Allan)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ENDORSED ORDER Granting [Doc. 180] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Charles E. Valles, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/18/2012. (kpt)
September 17, 2012 Filing 182 NOTICE by Reuben Morgan re #180 MOTION for Charles Valles to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1328528, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Completed Application for Admission) (Keahey, Grover)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ENDORSED ORDER Granting [Doc. 179] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Ben K. DuBose, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/14/2012. (kpt)
September 14, 2012 Filing 180 MOTION for Charles Valles to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1328528, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Valles, Charles)
September 14, 2012 Filing 179 MOTION for Ben Dubose to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1328515, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (DuBose, Ben)
September 13, 2012 Filing 178 Notice of Filing Notices of Depositions of Captain William A. Lowell, III, Stephen H. Dikman, M.D., Gerald Markowitz, Ph.D, & David Rosner, Ph.D filed by Bill Vann Company, Inc.. (Redditt, F.)
September 10, 2012 Filing 177 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing of Deposition Notice of Stephen H. Dikman, M.D. filed by Reuben Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
September 10, 2012 Filing 176 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing of Expert Reports filed by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Keahey, Grover)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Order granting #171 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Weyerhaeuser. All of plaintiff's claims asserted against defendant Weyerhaeuser Company are dismissed without prejudice. This action shall proceed with respect to plaintiff's claims against all remaining defendants. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/10/2012. (tgw)
August 27, 2012 Filing 174 Objection re: #172 Notice (Other) filed by Reuben Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Order re: #171 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Weyerhaeuser Without Prejudice filed by Weyerhaeuser Company. Responses due by 9/4/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/27/2012. (tgw)
August 24, 2012 Filing 172 NOTICE by Bill Vann Company, Inc. of Filing of Deposition Notice of Captain William A. Lowell, III (Redditt, F.)
August 22, 2012 Filing 171 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Weyerhaeuser Without Prejudice Under Rule 41 by Weyerhaeuser Company. (Redditt, F.)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Order granting #166 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice, construed as a Motion for Pro Tanto Dismissal. All of Plaintiff's claims against defendant Cleaver Brooks, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/20/2012. (tgw)
August 16, 2012 Filing 169 Notice of Filing Notice of Deposition of Reuben Morgan filed by Weyerhaeuser Company. (Redditt, F.)
August 8, 2012 Filing 168 Notice of Filing Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Reuben Morgan filed by Weyerhaeuser Company. (Redditt, F.)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order re: #166 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Cleaver Brooks, Inc. Responses due by 8/13/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/8/2012. (tgw)
August 7, 2012 Filing 166 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Wetzler, Ernest)
August 6, 2012 Filing 165 Notice of Filing Deposition Notice filed by Weyerhaeuser Company. (Redditt, F.)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Weyerhaeuser's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Doc. 160). The deadline for fact discovery between Defendant Weyerhaeuser and Plaintiff is extended to September 13, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 7/13/2012. (Bivins, Sonja)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying #159 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/13/2012. (sdb)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel for the parties have advised the Court that the issues raised in the Motion to Quash (Doc. #157 ) have been resolved; thus, the motion is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 7/12/2012. (dfd)
July 11, 2012 Filing 161 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #156 filed by Weyerhaeuser Company. (Steele, William)
July 11, 2012 Filing 160 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Weyerhaeuser Company. (Redditt, F.)
July 11, 2012 Filing 159 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Keahey, Grover)
July 11, 2012 Filing 158 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's July 13, 2012 Unilateral Deposition Notice filed by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Keahey, Grover)
July 10, 2012 Filing 157 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's July 13, 2012 Unilateral Deposition Notice by Bill Vann Company, Inc.. (Clarke, Timothy)
July 10, 2012 Filing 156 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Weyerhaeuser Company. (Redditt, F.)
July 10, 2012 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Clarke on behalf of Weyerhaeuser Company (Clarke, Timothy)
July 5, 2012 Filing 154 NOTICE by Bill Vann Company, Inc. Second Amended Notice of Deposition of Melvin Morgan (Clarke, Timothy)
July 5, 2012 Filing 153 Notice of Filing Notice of Service filed by Reuben Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
July 5, 2012 Filing 152 NOTICE by Bill Vann Company, Inc. of Amended Notice of Deposition of Melvin Morgan (Clarke, Timothy)
July 5, 2012 Filing 151 NOTICE by Bill Vann Company, Inc. of Deposition of Melvin Morgan (Clarke, Timothy)
July 3, 2012 Filing 150 ANSWER to #138 Amended Complaint,,, (Second Amended Complaint) by Weyerhaeuser Company. (Redditt, F.)
June 19, 2012 Filing 149 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing Discovery filed by Reuben Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
June 14, 2012 Filing 148 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reuben Morgan. Weyerhaeuser Company served on 6/13/2012, answer due 7/5/2012. (Keahey, Grover)
June 13, 2012 Filing 147 Notice of Filing Interrogatories filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (McCormick, Gregg)
June 12, 2012 Filing 146 Summons Issued as to Weyerhaeuser Company. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tgw)
June 12, 2012 Filing 145 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Reuben Morgan on Weyerhaeuser Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Original Complaint) (Keahey, Grover)
June 11, 2012 Filing 144 NOTICE by Cleaver Brooks, Inc. of Service of Discovery (Wetzler, Ernest)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER DISMISSING without prejudice all of plaintiff's claims against the defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company in accordance with the #142 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/31/2012. (tgw)
May 25, 2012 Filing 142 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Waudby, William)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Order: The #135 Stipulation of Dismissal, construed as a Motion for Pro Tanto Dismissal is granted. Plaintiff's claims asserted against defendant Caterpillar, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/8/2012. (tgw)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order re: #138 Second Amended Complaint. All defendants other than Weyerhaeuser are excused from the obligation to file a responsive pleading to the Second Amended Complaint, as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/1/2012. (tgw)
May 1, 2012 Filing 139 The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company's ANSWER to #138 Amended Complaint,,, by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Waudby, William)
April 30, 2012 Filing 138 AMENDED COMPLAINT against A.W. Chesterton Co., Albany International Corporation, American Standard, Inc., Bill Vann Company, Inc., Buffalo Pumps Inc., CBS Corporation, Caterpillar, Inc., Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Crane Co., Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Crown Holdings Inc., Dana Companies LLC, Eaton Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Gorman-Rupp Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Motion Industries Inc., Mount Vernon Mills, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Schneider Electric USA Inc., Sepco Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Turner Supply, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, Weyerhaeuser Company, filed by Reuben Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is ordered, by 5/4/12, to file as a freestanding pleading the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/30/2012. (mbp)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Order entered re: #127 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Ratcliffe's Hardware, Inc., with Prejudice filed by Reuben Morgan. Any party wishing to be heard on this motion must file a response, supported by legal authority as appropriate, by 5/4/12. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/30/2012. (mbp)
April 27, 2012 Filing 135 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Best, Kristine)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Order re: #133 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Reuben Morgan. Responses due by 4/27/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/23/2012. (tgw)
April 20, 2012 Filing 133 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Stricken Second Amended Complaint) (Keahey, Grover)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Order re: #130 Second Amended Complaint filed by Reuben Morgan is stricken. Should plaintiff wish to pursue an amendment, he may do so by filing an appropriate Rule 15(a)(2) Motion by 4/20/12. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/16/2012. (mbp)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #127 construed Motion for Pro Tanto Dismissal. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2),Fed.R.Civ.P., all of plaintiffs claims asserted against defendant Ratcliffes Hardware, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his or its own costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Ratcliffes Hardware as a party defendant in this matter. This action shall proceed with respect to plaintiffs claims against all remaining defendants. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/16/2012. (mbp)
April 13, 2012 Filing 130 (Stricken per Order, Doc. 132) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Reuben Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Order re: #127 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Ratcliffe's Hardware, Inc., with Prejudice filed by Reuben Morgan. Responses due by 4/13/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/6/2012. (tgw)
April 6, 2012 Filing 128 Objection to Defendants' Proposed Protective Order. (Keahey, Grover)
April 6, 2012 Filing 127 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Ratcliffe's Hardware, Inc., with Prejudice by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Keahey, George)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Order re: #124 Defendants Proposed Protective Order. Plaintiff's objections are due by 4/6/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/2/2012. (tgw)
April 1, 2012 Filing 125 Joinder in Proposed Protective Order by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Best, Kristine) Modified on 4/2/2012 (tgw).
March 30, 2012 Filing 124 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Foster Wheeler Corporation, Crane Co., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Bill Vann Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Redditt, F.)
March 28, 2012 Filing 123 Notice of Filing Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by CBS Corporation. (Harris, James)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Order directing the parties by 4/2/2012 to file their joint proposed Protective Order or show cause why they are unable to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 3/26/2012. (tgw)
March 20, 2012 Filing 121 Notice of Filing Inital Disclosures filed by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Best, Kristine)
March 19, 2012 Filing 120 Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by Ratcliff's Hardware, Inc.. (Sullivan, Carroll)
March 19, 2012 Filing 119 NOTICE by Motion Industries Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Northcutt, Robert)
March 16, 2012 Filing 118 Notice of Filing Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Schneider Electric USA Inc.. (McDonough, Edward)
March 16, 2012 Filing 117 Notice of Filing Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Flowserve Corporation. (McDonough, Edward)
March 16, 2012 Filing 116 Notice of Filing Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Buffalo Pumps Inc.. (McDonough, Edward)
March 16, 2012 Filing 115 Notice of Filing Rule 26 initial Disclosures filed by A.W. Chesterton Co.. (McDonough, Edward)
March 15, 2012 Filing 114 NOTICE by Georgia-Pacific LLC of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Wheeler, Allan)
March 15, 2012 Filing 113 NOTICE by Union Carbide Corporation of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (McCormick, Gregg)
March 15, 2012 Filing 112 NOTICE by Eaton Corporation of Service of Initial Disclosures (Smyth, John)
March 15, 2012 Filing 111 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of Service of Initial Disclosures (Vercher, Michael)
March 15, 2012 Filing 110 Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Mills, William)
March 15, 2012 Filing 109 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing Discovery filed by Motion Industries Inc.. (Northcutt, Robert)
March 15, 2012 Filing 108 Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures Rule 26 (a)(1) by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Best, Kristine) Modified on 3/15/2012 (tgw).
March 15, 2012 Filing 107 NOTICE by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. of service of Rule 26 Disclosures (Sprain, Robert)
March 15, 2012 Filing 106 Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Reuben Morgan. (Keahey, Grover)
March 15, 2012 Filing 105 Notice of Filing initial disclosures filed by General Electric Company. (Evans, Jenelle)
March 15, 2012 Filing 104 Notice of Filing Discovery filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Waudby, William)
March 15, 2012 Filing 103 NOTICE by Sepco Corporation of Filing Initial Disclosures (Lankford, Frank)
March 15, 2012 Filing 102 NOTICE by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc. of Filing Initial Disclosures (Lankford, Frank)
March 15, 2012 Filing 101 NOTICE by John Crane, Inc. of Filing Initial Disclosures (Lankford, Frank)
March 15, 2012 Filing 100 NOTICE by Gorman-Rupp Company of Filing Initial Disclosures (Lankford, Frank)
March 15, 2012 Filing 99 NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. of Filing Initial Disclosures (Lankford, Frank)
March 15, 2012 Filing 98 Notice of Filing filed by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Crown Holdings Inc.. (Gilmer, Walter)
March 15, 2012 Filing 97 Notice of Filing RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Dana Companies LLC. (Davis, Evelyn)
March 15, 2012 Filing 96 NOTICE by Goulds Pumps, Inc. of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Redditt, F.)
March 15, 2012 Filing 95 NOTICE by Crane Co. of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Redditt, F.)
March 15, 2012 Filing 94 NOTICE by Bill Vann Company, Inc. of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Redditt, F.)
March 15, 2012 Filing 93 NOTICE by Foster Wheeler Corporation of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Redditt, F.)
March 14, 2012 Filing 92 Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by Defendants Albany International Corporation. (Pflaum, Keith) Modified on 3/15/2012 (tgw).
March 14, 2012 Filing 91 Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Wetzler, Ernest) Modified on 3/14/2012 (mjn).
March 12, 2012 Filing 90 ANSWER to Complaint as First Amended by Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Cavender, C.)
March 12, 2012 Filing 89 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 86), filed by Dana Companies LLC. (Bivins, Sonja)
March 12, 2012 Filing 88 ANSWER to Complaint by Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Cavender, C.)
March 8, 2012 Filing 87 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #86 filed by Dana Companies LLC. (Steele, William)
March 7, 2012 Filing 86 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Dana Companies LLC. (Davis, Evelyn)
February 20, 2012 Filing 85 NOTICE by Rockwell Automation, Inc. of Filing Order of Dismissal (Whatley, Mary)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2013 09:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Amended Pleadings due by 4/13/2012. Discovery cutoff 12/14/2012. Motions due by 12/31/2012. Jury Selection set for 5/7/2013 08:45 AM in Courtroom 2A before Chief Judge William H. Steele. Trial to be set during the month of May 2013. Position Regarding Settlement due by 12/14/2012. Joint Proposed Protective Order due by 3/15/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/16/12. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (tgw)
February 15, 2012 Filing 83 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Waudby, William)
February 13, 2012 Filing 82 NOTICE by Foster Wheeler Corporation of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Clarke, Timothy)
February 10, 2012 Filing 81 ENDORSED ORDER granting #80 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.(gg)
February 9, 2012 Filing 80 MOTION for George W. Fendley, III to Withdraw as Attorney by Gorman-Rupp Company, John Crane, Inc., Sepco Corporation. (Fendley, George)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order re: #78 Order Vacating Conditional Transfer Order. This action will not be transferred to the MDL. The parties are ordered to file the Rule 26 Meeting Report by 2/15/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/3/12. (tgw)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order Vacating Conditional Transfer Order No. 466 received from MDL Panel (tgw)
February 1, 2012 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint by Warren Pumps LLC. (Mills, William)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #68 Petition for Order to Mobile Infirmary Medical Center to Release Plaintiff's Pathology Material. Plaintiff's counsel has confirmed that the request is now moot in light of Doc. #75 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/30/2012. (dfd)
January 26, 2012 Filing 75 RESPONSE to Motion re: #68 MOTION For Order to Medical Facility to Release Patholgoy Material Response to Plaintiff's Motion filed by Mobile Infirmary Association. (Perry, Wade)
January 24, 2012 Filing 74 RETURN OF SERVICE of Order, Doc. 73, served 1/23/12 as to Mobile Infirmary Medical Center. (tgw)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order re: #68 MOTION For Order to Medical Facility to Release Patholgoy Material filed by Reuben Morgan. Mobile Infirmary is ordered to file a response by 1/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/19/2012. Copy mailed to Mobile Infirmary Medical Center via certified mail as directed. (tgw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2012: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (tgw).
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ENDORSED ORDER granting Catherine McCormack's Motion to Withdraw as counsel for Defendant Dana Companies, LLC (Doc. 70). Evelyn Davis is substituted as counsel for Dana Companies, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/19/2012. (Bivins, Sonja)
January 18, 2012 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Evelyn Fletcher Davis on behalf of Dana Companies LLC (Davis, Evelyn)
January 18, 2012 Filing 70 MOTION to Withdraw Catherine A. McCormack as counsel of record by Dana Companies LLC. (Davis, Evelyn)
January 13, 2012 Filing 69 Notice of Appearance filed by Defendant Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Wetzler, Ernest) Text Modified on 1/17/2012 (tgw).
January 10, 2012 Filing 68 MOTION For Order to Medical Facility to Release Patholgoy Material by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Keahey, Grover)
January 9, 2012 Filing 67 Attorney Admission & ECF Registration Letter mailed to Mary Brunson Whatley; Admission Application & ECF Registration due within 7 days. (tgw)
January 9, 2012 Filing 66 Attorney Admission & ECF Registration Letter mailed to Catherine A. McCormack; Admission Application & ECF Registration due within 7 days. (tgw)
January 6, 2012 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Ernest L. Wetzler, II on behalf of Cleaver Brooks, Inc. (Wetzler, Ernest)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ENDORSED ORDER granting Evelyn F. Davis and Catherine A. McCormack's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Union Carbide Corporation (Doc. 52). Attorneys Evelyn F. Davis and Catherine A. McCormack terminated as counsel for Union Carbide Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/5/2012. (Bivins, Sonja)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot Defendants' Motion for Relief from Rule 26(f) requirements. (Doc. 49). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/5/2012.(Bivins, Sonja)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion seeking extension of deadline for parties' Rule 26(f) report. (Doc. 51). If the Objection pending before the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation is granted, and the Conditional Transfer Order rescinded, the parties shall meet and file their joint Rule 26(f) report within fourteen (14) days of said ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/5/2012. (Bivins, Sonja)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ENDORSED ORDER granting William Leroy Waudby's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Caterpillar, Inc. (Doc. 60). Attorney William Leroy Waudby terminated as counsel for Caterpillar, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/5/2012. (Bivins, Sonja)
January 5, 2012 Filing 60 MOTION for William L. Waudby to Withdraw as Attorney by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Waudby, William)
January 4, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine McIntyre Best on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Best, Kristine)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER finding as moot #38 MOTION for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Remand to State Court; granting #48 Motion to Expedite Ruling by Magistrate Judge; denying #39 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting #57 Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike or Exclude by CBS Corporation and General Electric Company. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/6/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
November 30, 2011 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike or Exclude by CBS Corporation and General Electric Company by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1) (Harris, James)
November 28, 2011 Filing 56 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of Chief Judge William H. Steele. To ensure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (Consent form not filed on 11/21/11) (mjn)
November 23, 2011 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Earnhardt, John)
November 23, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg Mitchel McCormick on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (McCormick, Gregg)
November 23, 2011 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by John Aaron Earnhardt on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Earnhardt, John)
November 22, 2011 Filing 52 MOTION for Evelyn F. Davis and Catherine A. McCormack to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel by Union Carbide Corporation. (Davis, Evelyn)
November 21, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION Amended Motion for Relief from Requirements of Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f) and Local Rule 26.1 or in the Alternative, For An Extension of Time by Bill Vann Company, Inc.. (Clarke, Timothy)
November 21, 2011 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Waudby, William)
November 21, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION Relief from Requirements of Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f) and Local Rule 26.1 by Bill Vann Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Clarke, Timothy)
November 18, 2011 Filing 48 MOTION to Expedite Ruling by Magistrate Judge by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Keahey, Grover)
November 15, 2011 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion #39 , #38 filed by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E-1, #6 Exhibit E-2, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (Keahey, Grover)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply(Doc. 45). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/7/2011. (Bivins, Sonja)
November 7, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by All Plaintiffs. (Keahey, Grover)
November 2, 2011 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #38 MOTION to Remand to State Court by CBS Corporation and General Electric Company filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F-1, #7 Exhibit F-2, #8 Exhibit F-3, #9 Exhibit F-4, #10 Exhibit F-5, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J) (Harris, James)
November 2, 2011 Remark: Notice of assignment previously entered deleted from case; Please refer to Notice of assignment issued October 6, 2011 #36 ; (mjn)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendants CBS Corporation and General Electric Company's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Doc. 42). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/27/2011. (Bivins, Sonja)
October 26, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Joint Brief of CBS Corporation and General Electric Company by CBS Corporation. (Harris, James)
October 21, 2011 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint by Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.. (Lankford, Frank)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #38 MOTION for expedited consideration of motion to Remand to State Court filed by Reuben Morgan, #39 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Reuben Morgan; Responses due by 11/3/2011; Replies due by 11/10/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/18/2011. (mjn)
October 14, 2011 Filing 39 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Keahey, Grover)
October 14, 2011 Filing 38 MOTION for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Remand to State Court by Reuben Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Keahey, Grover) Modified on 11/28/2011 (tgw).
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/21/2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/6/2011. (mjn)
October 6, 2011 Filing 36 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. Consent Form due by 11/21/2011. (Attachments: #1 consent form) (mjn)
September 27, 2011 Filing 35 Documents endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 34), filed by Flowserve Corporation, Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 31), filed by Eaton Corporation, Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 32), filed by Schneider Electric USA Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 33), filed by Buffalo Pumps Inc. (Bivins, Sonja)
September 26, 2011 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (McDonough, Edward)
September 26, 2011 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Buffalo Pumps Inc.. (McDonough, Edward)
September 26, 2011 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Schneider Electric USA Inc.. (McDonough, Edward)
September 26, 2011 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (Collier, Katherine)
September 23, 2011 Filing 30 Documents endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 21), filed by Warren Pumps LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement(Doc. 13), filed by Foster Wheeler Corporation, Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 20), filed by Albany International Corporation, Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 27), filed by John Crane, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 26), filed by Honeywell International, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 19), filed by A.W. Chesterton Co., Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 24), filed by Ratcliff's Hardware, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 28), filed by Sepco Corporation, Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 25), filed by Georgia-Pacific LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 29), filed by Gorman-Rupp Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 22), filed by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 23), filed by Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., and Crown Holdings Inc. (Bivins, Sonja)
September 23, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE by Gorman-Rupp Company of Corporate Disclosure (Lankford, Frank)
September 22, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE by Sepco Corporation of Corporate Disclosure (Lankford, Frank)
September 22, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE by John Crane, Inc. of Corporate Disclosure (Lankford, Frank)
September 22, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE by Honeywell International, Inc. of Corporate Disclosure (Lankford, Frank)
September 22, 2011 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Wheeler, Allan)
September 22, 2011 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Ratcliff's Hardware, Inc.. (Sullivan, Carroll)
September 22, 2011 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Crown Holdings Inc.. (Gilmer, Walter)
September 22, 2011 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc.. (Sprain, Robert)
September 22, 2011 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Warren Pumps LLC, Colfax Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps LLC.. (Mills, William)
September 22, 2011 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Albany International Corporation. (Pflaum, Keith)
September 21, 2011 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant A.W. Chesterton Co.. (McDonough, Edward)
September 21, 2011 Filing 18 Documents endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 11), filed by Bill Vann Company, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 12), filed by Crane Co., Corporate Disclosure Statement(Doc. 15), filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 14), filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 16), filed by Caterpillar, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 17), filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 10), filed by Motion Industries Inc. (Bivins, Sonja)
September 20, 2011 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Scott, Joi)
September 20, 2011 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.. (Waudby, William)
September 20, 2011 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Waudby, William)
September 20, 2011 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Clarke, Timothy)
September 20, 2011 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Redditt, F.)
September 20, 2011 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Crane Co.. (Redditt, F.)
September 20, 2011 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Bill Vann Company, Inc.. (Redditt, F.)
September 19, 2011 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Motion Industries Inc.. (Northcutt, Robert)
September 19, 2011 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Mailed ; Defendants' Disclosure Statement Due 9/26/2011. (mjn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2011: #1 LR3.4 and disclosure form) (mjn).
September 16, 2011 Filing 8 Documents endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 5), filed by CBS Corporation, and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 7), filed by General Electric Company. (Bivins, Sonja)
September 15, 2011 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant General Electric Company. (Evans, Jenelle)
September 15, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE by CBS Corporation and General Electric Company of Tag-Along Action (Harris, James)
September 15, 2011 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Harris, James)
September 15, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by CBS Corporation re: #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D) (Harris, James)
September 15, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by CBS Corporation re: #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-2 Part 14, #2 Exhibit A-2 Part 15, #3 Exhibit A-2 Part 16, #4 Exhibit A-2 Part 17, #5 Exhibit A-2 Part 18, #6 Exhibit A-2 Part 19, #7 Exhibit A-2 Part 20, #8 Exhibit A-2 Part 21, #9 Exhibit A-2 Part 22) (Harris, James)
September 15, 2011 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by CBS Corporation re: #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-2 Part 9, #2 Exhibit A-2 Part10, #3 Exhibit A-2 Part 11, #4 Exhibit A-2 Part 12, #5 Exhibit A-2 Part 13) (Harris, James)
September 15, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CBS Corporation and General Electric Company from Wilcox County Circuit Court, case number 2011-900022. ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt number 1128-1150314, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2 Part 1, #3 Exhibit A-2 Part 2, #4 Exhibit A-2 Part 3, #5 Exhibit A-2 Part 4, #6 Exhibit A-2 Part 5, #7 Exhibit A-2 Part 6, #8 Exhibit A-2 Part 7, #9 Exhibit A-2 Part 8) (Harris, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2011: #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (mjn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Bill Vann Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Standard, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Represented By: Donald C. Partridge
Represented By: James G. House, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Ernest L. Wetzler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Vann Company, Inc.
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Represented By: Roy Wallace Harrell, III
Represented By: Timothy A. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany International Corporation
Represented By: Keith J. Pflaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps Inc.
Represented By: Edward B. McDonough, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Co.
Represented By: Edward B. McDonough, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser Company
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy A. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Represented By: Roy Wallace Harrell, III
Represented By: Timothy A. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: William T. Mills, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Joi C. Scott
Represented By: Michael Anthony Vercher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Represented By: Roy Wallace Harrell, III
Represented By: Timothy A. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Helen Kathryn Downs
Represented By: Mary Brunson Salser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Edward B. McDonough, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Donald C. Partridge
Represented By: S. Allen Baker, Jr.
Represented By: Jenelle R. Evans
Represented By: James G. House, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Catherine Ann McCormack
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Industries Inc.
Represented By: Robert F. Northcutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Gregg Mitchel McCormick
Represented By: John Aaron Earnhardt
Represented By: Catherine Ann McCormack
Represented By: Evelyn Fletcher Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc.
Represented By: Walter T. Gilmer, Jr.
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Frank E. Lankford, Jr.
Represented By: Stewart W. McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: William L. Waudby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gorman-Rupp Company
Represented By: George W. Fendley, III
Represented By: Frank E. Lankford, Jr.
Represented By: Stewart W. McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Raymond Griffin
Represented By: George W. Fendley, III
Represented By: Frank E. Lankford, Jr.
Represented By: Stewart W. McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: William L. Waudby
Represented By: Kristine McIntyre Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ratcliff's Hardware, Inc.
Represented By: Carroll H. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA Inc.
Represented By: Edward B. McDonough, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc.
Represented By: Robert H. Sprain, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepco Corporation
Represented By: George W. Fendley, III
Represented By: Frank E. Lankford, Jr.
Represented By: Stewart W. McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Represented By: Roy Wallace Harrell, III
Represented By: Timothy A. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Vernon Mills, Inc.
Represented By: Frank E. Lankford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Crump
Represented By: Donald C. Partridge
Represented By: James G. House, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: John A. Smyth, III
Represented By: Katherine Ann Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Walter T. Gilmer, Jr.
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: James A. Harris, III
Represented By: Nicole Mapp Hardee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: William L. Durham, II
Represented By: Allan R. Wheeler
Represented By: Bruce T. Bishop
Represented By: Scott Bolman Pfahl
Represented By: C. Paul Cavender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Mobile Infirmary Association
Represented By: Wade B. Perry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Melvin Morgan
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Represented By: Charles Edward Valles
Represented By: Ben DuBose
Represented By: Grover Patterson Keahey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuben Morgan
Represented By: George M. Keahey
Represented By: Charles Edward Valles
Represented By: Ben DuBose
Represented By: Grover Patterson Keahey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Michael E. Upchurch
Represented By: Michael E. Upchurch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?