Parke et al v. Glover et al

Plaintiff: Parke Properties, LLC, Land Investments Properties, Inc. and Charles Rodney Parke
Defendant: Ed Glover and Valley Creek Land Company of York, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv00639
Filed: November 10, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court CHARGING ORDER to become effective on Tuesday, May 6, 2014, unless rescinded by the Court. Said LLCs are ORDERED to report to the Plaintiffs each time a distribution is made with respect to any transferable interest, listing the amount and time of all distributions made at the time or in connection with that distribution, and distribute to the Plaintiffs any amounts that become due or distributable to Ed Glover. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/21/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 4, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs Charles Rodney Parke, Parke Properties, LLC, and Land Investments Properties, Inc., and against Defendants Ed Glover and Valley Creek Land Company of York, LLC, jointly and severally, in the amount of $409,000.00 ($309,000.00 for the jury's verdict and $100,000.00 in attorney's fees and costs), plus post-judgment interest in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/4/2013. (sdb)
February 5, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiffs are awarded $100,000.00 in attorney's fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/5/2013. (cmj)
October 15, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Summary Judgment, as set out. Pre-trial briefs shall be filed on or before 12/5/12 analyzing Alabama law on the breach of contract claim as it applies to the facts in this case. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/15/2012. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parke et al v. Glover et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parke Properties, LLC
Represented By: Thomas W. H. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Land Investments Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas W. H. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rodney Parke
Represented By: Thomas W. H. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Creek Land Company of York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?