Muhammad v. Bethel-Muhammad et al

Plaintiff: Kalim A.R. Muhammad
Defendant: Robert Armstrong, Paul Vaughn Russell, Equifax Credit Reporting Agency, Brenda Bethel-Muhammad, Lajenna Hatcher, Dallas County Department of Human Resources, Alabama Department of Human Resources, Experian Credit Reporting Agency and Alabama Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2011cv00690
Filed: December 6, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 211 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff. All claims against Bethel are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/17/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff & Brenda Bethel-Muhammad on 10/17/13. (tgw)
October 7, 2013 251 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's orders of May 21, 2012, November 28, 2012, and October 7, 2013, the plaintiff shall recover nothing from defendants Dallas County Department of Human Resources, Alabama Department of Human Resources, LaJ enna Hatcher, Robert Armstrong and Paul Vaughan Russell. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, judgment is hereby entered in favor of these defendants and against plaintiff Kalim A.R. Muhammad and the Family of Kalim A.R. Muhammad. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/7/2013. (tgw)
January 2, 2013 158 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 149 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Kalim A.R. Muhammad. Defendants Bethel & Armstrong are ordered to Show Cause by 1/18/2013 why default should not be entered against them for failure to file an answer. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/2/2013. Copy mailed to Plaintiff, Brenda Bethel-Muhammad & Paul Vaughn Russell. (tgw)
June 19, 2012 123 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 121 Notice To The Court Regarding Paul Russell Vaughn's Brief in Response To Court's Order To Reply By June 11, 2012 filed by Kalim A.R. Muhammad. The reply to Russell's answer, styled as a notice to the Court, is STRICKEN. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 6/19/2012. Copy mailed to Plaintiff, Paul Vaughn Russell & Brenda Bethel-Muhammad. (tgw)
May 21, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Dismiss; denying 46 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 5/21/2012. Copy mailed to Plaintiff, Paul Vaughn Russell & Brenda Bethel-Muhammad. (tgw)
April 24, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying without prejudice the 81 Reiterated and Recycled Motion and Application for Default Judgment against Brenda Bethel. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/24/2012. Copy mailed to Plaintiff & Paul Vaughn Russell. (tgw)
March 26, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 66 Motion and Application to Clerk for Entry of Default as to Brenda Bethel filed by Kalim A.R. Muhammad. The motion is denied, without prejudice to his ability to seek default at an appropriate time. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/26/2012. Copy mailed to Plaintiff & Paul Vaughn Russell. (tgw)
January 24, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered re 5 Motion to Dismiss and 12 Motion to Dismiss. Motions are DENIED as MOOT, w/o prejudice to the movants' ability to file similar motions should the plaintiff file an amended complaint that withstands initial judicial scrutiny . The plaintiff's request for recusal, (Doc. 1 at 6, 98), is DENIED. The plaintiff's application for default, (Doc. 19), construed as a motion for entry of default, is DENIED. Plaintiff will be required to serve his amended complaint on de fendant Bethel in accordance with Rule 4. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file and serve, on or before February 7, 2012, an amended complaint satisfying the pleading requirements set forth herein and in the Courts orders entered in Muhammad I. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/24/2012. Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff (clr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Bethel-Muhammad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Vaughn Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Reporting Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Bethel-Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lajenna Hatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County Department of Human Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Human Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Credit Reporting Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalim A.R. Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?