NB v. Demopolis City Board of Education
Plaintiff: NB
Defendant: Demopolis City Board of Education
Case Number: 2:2012cv00012
Filed: January 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Selma Office
County: Marengo
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER entered re; 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. It is ORDERED that Defendant Demopolis City Board of Educations Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Judgment shall issue separately in accordance with this Order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/7/2012. (mca)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Alvin Griffin. The Court substitutes, in the style of this matter, the real party in interest, the Demopolis City Board of Education, instead of Robert Alvin Griffin and dismisses Griffin from this action by granting his motion to dismiss (doc. 4). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/19/2012. (cmj)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Alvin Griffin. It is recommended that the Court substitute, in the style of this matter, the real party in interest, the Demopolis City Board of Education, instead of Robert Alvin Griffin and dismiss Griffin from this action by granting his motion to dismiss (doc. 4). Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/29/2012. (cmj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NB v. Demopolis City Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NB
Represented By: Shane Thomas Sears
Represented By: James D. Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demopolis City Board of Education
Represented By: Alexander Fournier Braswell
Represented By: J. R. Brooks
Represented By: Rodney C. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?