Sawyer v. Collins et al

Plaintiff: Johnnie Mae Sawyer
Defendant: James Hood, Sylvia Collins and Bobby Sanders
Case Number: 2:2012cv00020
Filed: January 12, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2014 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 170 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/18/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
February 25, 2014 169 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered. Plaintiff Johnnie Mae Sawyers claims pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983 are dismissed with prejudice and JUDGMENT is entered against Sawyer and in favor of all defendants on Sawyers claims in Count I of the Second Amended Complaint; and 2) Sawyers state law claims against defendants Sylvia Collins and Bobby Sanders (Count 2) are DISMISSED without prejudice and the Court declines to continue exercising supplemental jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/24/2014. (cmj)
June 6, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Report and Recommendation (doc. 61) as set out, re: 56 MOTION to Dismiss FRCP 12(b)(1) by Sylvia Collins, Bobby Sanders and 40 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Sylvia Collins, James Hood, Bobby Sanders. Defendants Sylvia Collins and Bobby Sanders motion to dismiss the common law negligence claims against them is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/5/2013. (cmj)
December 5, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court Order certifying question to the Alabama Supreme Court re: 61 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 56 MOTION to Dismiss FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by Bobby Sanders, Sylvia Collins and 40 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by James Hood, Bobby Sanders, Sylvia Collins.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/5/2012. (cmj)
July 13, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Amend Complaint. Sawyer to file amended complaint on or before 7/24/12. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/13/2012. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. Collins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Mae Sawyer
Represented By: Bruce Boynton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?