Great West Casualty Company v. Firstfleet, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Company
Defendant: Tennessee American Recycling, LLC, Earl Fergerson, RBX, Inc. and Firstfleet, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00623
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Wilcox
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Great West Casualty Company against Firstfleet, Inc., RBX, Inc., Earl Fergerson. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/25/2014. (cmj)
August 15, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered that after due and proper consideration of the issues raised, and there having been no objections filed, the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. 61) dated July 17, 2013, is ADOPTED as modified as theopinion of this Court. It is ORDERED that Defendant FirstFleet, Inc.s motion to dismiss, or alternatively, to stay (Doc. 30) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as fully set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/15/2013. (mca)
July 2, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Stay Discovery; granting 53 Motion for protective order. Discovery may proceed as to issues relevant to the issues in the declaratory judgment action only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/2/2013. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great West Casualty Company v. Firstfleet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee American Recycling, LLC
Represented By: James Taylor Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Fergerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firstfleet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Richard E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?