KTK Mining of Virginia, LLC v. City of Selma, Alabama et al

Plaintiff: KTK Mining of Virginia, LLC
Defendant: City of Selma, Alabama and William T. Riley
Case Number: 2:2012cv00655
Filed: October 16, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this action with prejudice subject to the Court retaining jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement for a period of one year from the date of the aforementioned Order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/12/2013. (cmj)
October 31, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting KTK's 58 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and the City's Motion for Summary Judgment 57 is denied as to KTK's procedural due process claims only, as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/31/2013. (cmj)
July 2, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss. Accordingly, these specific claims, as set forth in the following Counts, are NOT DISMISSED and remain in this case: Count One (First Amendment and procedur al due process claim); Count Four (conversion as to personal property); Count Five (negligence and wantonness); Count Seven (permanent injunctive relief); and Count Eight (appeal of the suspension/revocation of KTK's building permit by the City of Selma). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/2/2013. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KTK Mining of Virginia, LLC v. City of Selma, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KTK Mining of Virginia, LLC
Represented By: John Wesley Kelly, IV
Represented By: John W. Kelly, III
Represented By: J. Wesley Kelly, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Selma, Alabama
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Riley
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?