Bates v. United States General Services Administration et al

Plaintiff: Carolyn Bates
Defendant: United States General Services Administration and United States Federal Government/Courthouse
Case Number: 2:2013cv00051
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2015 184 Opinion or Order of the Court Order that judgment is entered in favor of Bates and against the Government and that Bates is awarded $1,543.33. Any objections by the government to costs to be taxed should be filed by 10/23/15. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/14/2015. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
August 21, 2015 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 167 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS entered. It is ORDERED that the motion for entry of dismissal as a sanction 135 is DENIED; the motions to substitute the affidavits of Brenda Howell and Frances Davis 153 and 154 are GRANTED; t he motion for a default judgment 144 is DENIED; the motion to maintain documents under seal 151 is GRANTED; and Plaintiff's various objections are either MOOT or OVERRULED, as set out. The motion for summary judgment 135 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set out.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/21/2015. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
August 29, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 91 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court The Magistrate Judge's decision (doc. 87) is affirmed. Regarding Plaintiff's motion for recusal, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/28/2014. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
March 12, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 49 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for Partial Dismissal filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The Motion for Partial Dismissal is granted in part and denied in part as set out in R&R.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/12/2014. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
August 21, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as premature 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & 13 Motion for Leave to File as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/19/2013. Copies to parties. (mpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. United States General Services Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States General Services Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Federal Government/Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?