Langford v. Hale County AL Commission et al

Plaintiff: Ann Langford
Defendant: Hale County AL Commission and Hale County Probate Judge
Case Number: 2:2014cv00070
Filed: February 18, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Hale
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Ann Langford against Hale County AL Commission and Arthur Crawford in his official capacity.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/16/2016. (cmj)
September 1, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 25 Motion for Summary Judgment by plaintiff and 28 Motion for Summary Judgment by defendant. Count I - Langfords motion for summary judgment is granted as to Count I. Damages are reservedfor trial. Defendants motion for summary judg ment is denied as to Count I. Defendant Crawfords motion for summary judgment on basis that he is entitled to qualified immunity in his individual capacity is granted.Counts II, IV and VI - Defendants motion for summary judgment as to Counts II, IV, and VI alleging discrimination on basis of race is denied. Defendant Crawfords motion forsummary judgment on basis that he is entitled to qualified immunity in his individualcapacity isdenied.Count III Defendants motion for summary judgment is denie d as to Defendantsargument that Langford is a confidential employee who is not protected by the First Amendment.Defendants motion for summary judgment on basis that there is no causal connection betweenLangfords past speech regarding voter fraud and voter intimidation is granted. Defendantsmotion for summary judgment on basis that there was no causal connection between Langfords political association with Judge Avery and her termination is denied. Defendant Crawfordsmotion for summary judgment o n basis that he is entitled to qualified immunity in his individual capacity is granted.Count V - Langford conceded her claim of age discrimination. Therefore, Defendants motion for summary judgment is granted.Count VII (retaliation) - Defendants motion for summary judgment is granted.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/1/2015. (cmj)
June 26, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REVISING IN PART 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Hale County Probate Judge, Hale County AL Commission. It is ORDERED that the Defendants PartialMotion to Dismiss (Doc. 7) is GRANTED as to Langfords claim in Count I of the Complaint that she was denied due process in her post-termination proceedings, and is otherwise DENIED. Copy to Plaintiff by mail on this date. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/26/2014. (adk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langford v. Hale County AL Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Langford
Represented By: Charles M. Ingrum, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hale County AL Commission
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hale County Probate Judge
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?