Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Nall's Newton Tire

Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Nall's Newton Tire
Counter_claimant: Nall's Newton Tire
Counter_defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv00110
Filed: March 11, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Marengo
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2016 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Dft's 145 Motion for Order to Clerk's Office to Endorse Over Partial Payment of Judgment is DENIED as MOOT as set out. Dft's 144 Motion to Issue Second Check to Satisfy Judgment is deemed MOOT as set out. The Clerk is directed to disburse the $362,119.97 in funds to defense counsel as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/4/2016. (copy to finance) (tot)
December 10, 2015 143 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Dft Nall's Newton Tire on its counter-claim for breach contract damages against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company in the amount of $318,500.00 in damages plus 6% pre-judgment interest on that award since 8/15/13 through the date of this final judgment & costs in the amount of $5,344.67. Post judgment interest is awarded at the statutory rate of.54% as set out. Plf's claim for declaratory relief is DISMISSED w/PREJUDICE. Judgment is entered in favor of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company & against Nall's Newton Tire on Nall's Newton Tire's counterclaim for bad faith. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/10/2015. (tot)
December 7, 2015 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, 128 MOTION for New Trial or, Alternatively, for Remittitur filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company is GRANTED to the extent that the damage award in this case is reduced to $318,500.00. 130 Motion to Tax Costs & Prejudgment I nterest filed by Nall's Newton Tire is GRANTED in part to the extent that Nall's Newton Tire is granted 6% prejudgment interest from 8/15/13 through the date of judgment & costs are taxed in the amount of $5,344.67 as set out. (T he motion is DENIED in part to the extent that the prejudgment interest applies only to the reduced damage award and $398.60 is excluded from the claimed costs.) Nall's Newton Tire is to file a proposed Final Judgment consistent w/this order NLT 12/11/15. 138 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company is DENIED as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/7/2015. (tot)
August 13, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company's 50 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part to the extent that summary judgment is granted in favor of Nationwide on Nall's Newton Tire's counterclaim for bad faith as set out, but DENIED as to Nationwide's declaratory complaint & Nall's Newton Tire's counterclaim for breach of contract as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/13/2015. (tot)
August 12, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Dft's 81 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Bryan Cash & Jeb Harrison as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/12/2015. (tot)
August 11, 2015 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plf's 68 Motion to Strike in part as set out. The Court STRIKES portions of the 62 Affidavits of Freddie Webb & Andy Renner as set out. In all other respects, the Plf's 68 Motion to Strike is DENIED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/11/2015. (tot)
August 7, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company's 19 Motion to Amend Counterclaim as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/7/2014. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Nall's Newton Tire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lynn Etheridge Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nall's Newton Tire
Represented By: Louis Hunter Compton, Jr.
Represented By: K. Scott Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Nall's Newton Tire
Represented By: Louis Hunter Compton, Jr.
Represented By: K. Scott Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lynn Etheridge Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?