Evans v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Richard Evans
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2014cv00303
Filed: June 30, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Marengo
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered GRANTING 27 Motion for Attorney Fees and that Coplin is awarded a reasonable fee under § 406(b) in the amount of $8,782.12, as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 4/19/2017. (clr)
May 8, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. In accordance with the Order entered this date, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that JUDGMENT be entered in favor of Plaintiff Richard Evans and against Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. Plaintiff be AWARDED an EAJA attorneys fee in the amount of $2,066.42 and $492.96 in court costs and litigation expenses.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 5/8/2015. (clr)
March 12, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in accordance with the Order entered this date. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that JUDGMENT be entered in favor of Plaintiff Richard Evans and against Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 3/12/2015. (clr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Evans
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?