Gabriel et al v. Life Options International, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert Gabriel, Joseph Habshey, Mary Shanklin, Carl Most, John Cabral, Marilyn Sikora, RMG International, Inc. and AZMACOMP, Inc.
Defendant: Aragon, n/k/a Veritrust Financial, LLC and AIG Property Casualty Company
Cross_claimant: VeriTrust
Cross_defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv00358
Filed: July 31, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Defendant, Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, and against Plaintiffs, Joseph Habshey, Mary Shanklin, Carl Most, John Cabral, RMG International, Inc., AZMACOMP , Inc., and Veritrust Financial, LLC. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Costs are taxed against Plaintiffs. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/5/2016. (mab)
April 30, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Veritrust's 20 Motion to Remand & Plfs' 24 Motion to Remand as set out. Chartis Specialty's 27 Motion to Realign is GRANTED, & Veritrust is realigned as a Plf in this case as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/30/2015. (tot)
August 18, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING 10 MOTION to be Excused from Appearing at the Status Conference Scheduled for August 19, 2014 & 12 MOTION to Dismiss as set out. Dfts J. Michael Howard, Mike Howard Financial Services, Inc., & Life Options International, Inc. are DISMISSED from this case. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/18/2014. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriel et al v. Life Options International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gabriel
Represented By: Joseph H. Aughtman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher E. Sanspree(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Habshey
Represented By: Joseph H. Aughtman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher E. Sanspree(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Shanklin
Represented By: Joseph H. Aughtman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher E. Sanspree(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Most
Represented By: Joseph H. Aughtman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher E. Sanspree(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cabral
Represented By: Joseph H. Aughtman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher E. Sanspree(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Sikora
Represented By: Joseph H. Aughtman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher E. Sanspree(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RMG International, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph H. Aughtman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher E. Sanspree(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AZMACOMP, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph H. Aughtman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher E. Sanspree(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aragon, n/k/a Veritrust Financial, LLC
Represented By: Anil Ashok Mujumdar(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mark E. Tindal(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Jordan Lucas Lenger(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Graham R. Pulvere(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Stephen E. Whitehead(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: VeriTrust
Represented By: Mark E. Tindal(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Stephen E. Whitehead(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?