Champion v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Otis Champion
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2014cv00464
Filed: October 6, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Wilcox
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $11,495.01. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/16/2016. (srr)
July 8, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Attorney Fees (EAJA) in the amount of $1,841.99. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/8/2015. (srr)
April 10, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Remand to Agency; the Commissioner's final decision denying plaintiff DIB and SSI benefits is REVERSED and REMANDED for a rehearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/10/2015. (srr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champion v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Champion
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?