Blevins et al v. Aksut et al

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Blevins, Bruce Boynton and Rosemary Ervin
Defendant: Seydi Vakkas Aksut, Vaughan Regional Medical Center, LLC, LifePoint Hospitals, Inc., LifePoint RC, Inc., LifePoint CSGP, LLC, Baptist Health, Jackson Hospital & Clinic, Inc. and Selma Heart Institute, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00120
Filed: March 6, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2016 135 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plfs' Motion to Remand is DENIED, that Dfts' Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED as to Plfs' RICO claims, & that this Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plfs' remaining state-law claims & thus dismisses the claims without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/28/2016. (tot)
July 7, 2015 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Dfts' 118 Motion to Vacate State Court Filing & Enjoin Further Actions in State Court is GRANTED in part to the extent that the current Plfs & Plfs' counsel are ENJOINED until & unless this case is remanded, from attempting to proc eed in the Circuit Court of Dallas County, Alabama, w/any claims in Case No. 15-cv-900040, except that Plfs' counsel is ORDERED to file notice of this Order in the Circuit Court of Dallas County, Case No. 15-cv-900040, & the motion is & DENIED in part to the extent that this Court declines to enter an injunction against the Circuit Court of Dallas County, Alabama. Plfs' 120 Motion to Strike Dfts' motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/7/2015. (tot)
April 29, 2015 104 Opinion or Order of the Court Order, re: Plaintiff's 100 Appeal of the Magistrate's Order of April 17, 2015 staying discovery. The Magistrates Order of April 17, 2015 (Doc. 95 ) is hereby AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/29/2015. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blevins et al v. Aksut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Blevins
Represented By: Greg William Foster
Represented By: Joshua Patrick Hayes
Represented By: Timothy Dylan Reeves
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Boynton
Represented By: Greg William Foster
Represented By: Joshua Patrick Hayes
Represented By: Timothy Dylan Reeves
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Ervin
Represented By: Greg William Foster
Represented By: Joshua Patrick Hayes
Represented By: Timothy Dylan Reeves
Represented By: Donald W. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seydi Vakkas Aksut
Represented By: Ronald Larry Fantroy, Jr.
Represented By: Allen Christian King
Represented By: John Peter Crook McCall
Represented By: Michael K. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughan Regional Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: David L. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Hugh Cannon Lawley
Represented By: Walter J. Price, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifePoint Hospitals, Inc.
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Represented By: Justin Blake Carter
Represented By: C. J. Gideon, Jr.
Represented By: Rickman Edgar Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifePoint RC, Inc.
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Represented By: Justin Blake Carter
Represented By: C. J. Gideon, Jr.
Represented By: Rickman Edgar Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifePoint CSGP, LLC
Represented By: Alan S. Bean
Represented By: Justin Blake Carter
Represented By: C. J. Gideon, Jr.
Represented By: Rickman Edgar Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Health
Represented By: James F. Mozingo
Represented By: James E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Hospital & Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: L. Peyton Chapman, III
Represented By: Natalie Theresa Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selma Heart Institute, P.C.
Represented By: Ronald Larry Fantroy, Jr.
Represented By: Allen Christian King
Represented By: John Peter Crook McCall
Represented By: Michael K. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?