Davis v. Central Alabama Electric Cooperative

Plaintiff: William A. Davis
Defendant: Central Alabama Electric Cooperative
Case Number: 2:2015cv00131
Filed: March 10, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2 Motion to Dismiss or Stay; finding as moot 17 Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/4/15. (mbp)
August 11, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's Objection (Doc. 24) is overruled and the 8 MOTION to Remand is denied. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/11/2015. (tgw)
August 10, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 2 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Class Action Complaint filed by Central Alabama Electric Cooperative. Supplemental briefs are due by 8/24/2015. The Motion to Dismiss (doc 2) is denied insofar as it hinges on a challenge that venue is improper. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/10/2015. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Central Alabama Electric Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Davis
Represented By: Thomas E. Baddley, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Represented By: John C. Guin
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Mauro
Represented By: Stephen D. Wadsworth
Represented By: John Parker Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Alabama Electric Cooperative
Represented By: Dennis R. Bailey
Represented By: John Evans Bailey
Represented By: Richard McConnell Freeman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?