Thomas v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Robert D. Thomas
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2015cv00214
Filed: April 20, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Hale
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 26 Motion for Attorney Fees (EAJA). Plaintiff's Attorney has not satisfied the three EAJA statutory requirements necessary to receive Attorney's fees, as further set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 4/20/2016. (clr)
April 20, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in accordance with the Order entered this date. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that JUDGMENT be entered in favor of Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin and against Plaintiff Robert D. Thomas. It is further ORDERED that no award of EAJA Attorney Fees shall be awarded in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 4/20/2016. (clr)
February 17, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in accordance with the Order entered this date, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff Robert D. Tomas and against Defendant Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 2/17/2016. (clr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Thomas
Represented By: William T. Coplin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?