Galbreath v. Hale County Alabama Commission et al

Plaintiff: Tricia Galbreath
Defendant: Hale County, Alabama Commission, Hale County, Alabama and Arthur Crawford
Case Number: 2:2015cv00308
Filed: June 15, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON REQUEST TO RECONSIDER, 48 Order & Memorandum Opinion is SUPPLEMENTED to GRANT, in full, Dft's 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plf's defamation claim (Count 6) as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/17/2017. (tot)
February 1, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & MEMORANDUM OPINION, Dfts' 25 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part & DENIED in part as set out & Plf's 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/1/2017. (tot)
September 30, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Dfts' 7 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED in part & DENIED in part as set out. The 1 Complaint is PARTIALLY DISMISSED as set out. Counts 1, 2, & 7 are DISMISSED against Dft Crawford in his official capacity only. Count 6 is DISMISSED against Crawford in his individual capacity only. Counts 3 & 8 are DISMISSED against Crawford only, in their entirety. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/30/2015. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galbreath v. Hale County Alabama Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Galbreath
Represented By: Charles M. Ingrum, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hale County, Alabama Commission
Represented By: Robert Carter Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hale County, Alabama
Represented By: Robert Carter Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Crawford
Represented By: Robert Carter Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?