Heartland Catfish Company, Inc. v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Heartland Catfish Company, Inc.
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, Greenworks Holdings, L.L.C., SmarterFuel, Inc. and SmarterFuel South, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00368
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2017 152 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Navigators Specialty Insurance Company against Greenworks Holdings, L.L.C., Heartland Catfish Company, Inc., SmarterFuel South, L.L.C., SmarterFuel, Inc. Dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/16/2017. (srd)
May 15, 2017 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Navigators Specialty Insurance Company's 114 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out & DENYING Heartland Catfish Company, Inc's 117 Motion for Summary Judgment, 136 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/15/2017. (tot)
April 24, 2017 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Heartland Catfish Company, Inc.'s 99 Motion to Strike Mary Jane Watson as an Expert as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/24/2017. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heartland Catfish Company, Inc. v. Navigators Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartland Catfish Company, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald Glasco Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Joel S. Isenberg
Represented By: Susan Haygood McCurry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenworks Holdings, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SmarterFuel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SmarterFuel South, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?