Goldthrip et al v. Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Maeola Goldthrip and Vickie Goldthrip
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. and Johnson and Johnson
Case Number: 2:2015cv00651
Filed: December 22, 2015
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Johnson and Johnson. Defendant J & J's Motion to Dismiss is granted because personal jurisdiction is lacking. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/28/2016. (cmj)
July 27, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT is entered against the Plaintiffs and in favor ofDefendant Depuy Orthopaedics. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/27/2016. (srd)
May 13, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion for Leave to File a reply to defendant's reply; granting 16 Depuy's Motion for Summary Judgment as to all claims. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/13/2016. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldthrip et al v. Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maeola Goldthrip
Represented By: John Adam Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Goldthrip
Represented By: John Adam Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?