Hurry v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Lamonia Patrice Hurry
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv00417
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 Return of Service, U.S. Attny Gen served 10/4/18. (tot)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 Return of Service, SSA, Office of the General Counsel, served 10/2/18. (tot)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Nicole Beyer on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (Beyer, Patricia)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Nancy Berryhill; U.S. Attny served on 10/1/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (tot)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/28/18. (copy to U.S. Attny w/summons on 9/28/18) (tot)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill (SSA, U.S. Attny Gen, & U.S. Attny). (Attachment: #1 Cert. Mail Receipts) (tot)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Plaintiff Lamonia P. Hurry on the grounds that her motion shows that (1) she is unable to pay the costs of commencing this action and (2) the action, being an appeal from the denial of social security benefits, is not frivolous or malicious. See Boubonis v. Chater, 957 F. Supp. 1071, 1072 (E.D. Wis. 1997) (citing 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) & (e)(2)(B)(i)). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/26/18. (lto)
September 26, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (tot)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Lamonia P. Hurry (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) (Grecu, Monica)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lamonia P. Hurry. (Grecu, Monica)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill ( IFP.), filed by Lamonia P. Hurry. (Grecu, Monica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurry v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamonia Patrice Hurry
Represented By: Monica H. Grecu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?