Howerton v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Howerton
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00458
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint Referred to Judge Kristi K. DuBose (mcb)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson and is now assigned to the docket of Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose and Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (srr)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint by Robert Howerton. (Lay, Kenneth)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Howerton. (Lay, Kenneth)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. Consent Form due by 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 consent) (srr)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Motion Deadlines re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. Plaintiff's response to the motion must be filed and served no later than Mon. 11/19/2018. Defendants' reply to the response must be filed and served no later than Mon. 11/26/2018. Motion to be taken under submission on Tues. 11/27/2018. Once the motion is taken under submission, no further submissions related to the issues raised may be filed unless (1) the submission is in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(f)(3), or (2) the proponent obtains leave of court for good cause shown. Should the Court determine that oral argument would be beneficial, a hearing will be set by separate order. Otherwise, this motion is being submitted without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). "Oral argument requests must contain specific reasons why oral argument would be helpful." S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/30/2018. (ctn)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Searls, Jared)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #3 Joint Disclosure Statement filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., and Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/25/2018. (ctn)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., BANA Holding Corporation, BAC North America Holding Company, NB Holdings Corporation, Bank of America Corporation, Carrington Mortgage Holdings, LLC, Carrington Holding Company, LLC, The Carrington Companies, LLC, MERSCORP Holdings, Maroon Holding, LLC, Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Carrington Companies, LLC, Corporate Parent Carrington Mortgage Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Carrington Holding Company, LLC for Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC; Corporate Parent Maroon Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.; Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A... (Searls, Jared)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 consent) (srr)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC from Circuit Court of Marengo County, Alabama, case number 48-CV-2018-900103.00. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number 1128-2295803, Online Credit Card Payment.), filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Searls, Jared) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (srr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howerton v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Jared C Searls
Represented By: Jon Howard Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Jared C Searls
Represented By: Jon Howard Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Jared C Searls
Represented By: Jon Howard Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Howerton
Represented By: Kenneth James Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?