Richardson v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Veronica Richardson
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv00468
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 11/15/2018 as to U.S. Attorney General. (srd)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served 11/13/2018 as to SSA. (srd)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 11/9/2018, answer due 2/7/2019. (nah)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/07/2018. (Copy to US Atty with Summons) (nah)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill (SSA), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (nah)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Clerk to serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/07/2018. (nah)
November 6, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Veronica Richardson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) (Grecu, Monica)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Veronica Richardson. (Grecu, Monica)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill ( IFP.), filed by Veronica Richardson. (Grecu, Monica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Richardson
Represented By: Monica H. Grecu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?