Banks v. City of Greensboro, Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Banks
Defendant: Aaron Evans, Sr. and City of Greensboro, Alabama
Case Number: 2:2019cv00018
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 19 The Parties' Consent To The Exercise Of Jurisdiction By A United States Magistrate Judge #17 is NOTED. It is ORDERED that this case be referred and reassigned to the Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c), and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73. Signed by U.S. District Judge William H. Steele. (Steele, William)
March 13, 2019 REFERRAL OF #17 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge to Judge Steele. (srr)
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Greensboro, Alabama. (Crowder, Alan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Aaron Evans, Sr, City of Greensboro, Alabama.. (Gaillard, Thomas)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 City of Greensboro, Alabama's Motion to Dismiss with prejudice as to Claims II, III and V. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/27/19. (srr)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sarah Banks. (Gill, Patricia)
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. Consent Form due by 3/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 consent) (srr)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/14/19. (Attachments: #1 consent) (srr)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER [TEXT ONLY] Setting Motion Deadlines re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Greensboro, Alabama. Plaintiff's response to the motion, if any, must be filed and served no later than Tues. 3/5/2019. Replies to the response, if any, must be filed and served no later than Tues. 3/12/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on Wed. 3/13/2019. Once the motion is taken under submission, no further submissions related to the issues raised may be filed unless (1) the submission is in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(f)(3), or (2) the proponent obtains leave of court for good cause shown. Should the Court determine that oral argument would be beneficial, a hearing will be set by separate order. Otherwise, this motion is being submitted without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). "Oral argument requests must contain specific reasons why oral argument would be helpful." S.D. Ala. CivLR 7(h). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/13/2019. (ctn)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aaron Evans, Sr. (Gaillard, Thomas)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Greensboro, Alabama. (Crowder, Alan)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Steverson, Sr on behalf of City of Greensboro, Alabama (Steverson, Dennis)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed on the City of Greensboro by Sarah Banks. City of Greensboro, Alabama served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019 (Gill, Patricia)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed on Defendant Aaron "Duddley" Evans by Sarah Banks. Aaron Evans, Sr served on 1/21/2019, answer due 2/11/2019 (Gill, Patricia)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment) (srr)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Service Notice entered 1/16/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service deadline set to 3/1/2019. (srr)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Greensboro, Alabama, Aaron Evans, Sr. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srr)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Sarah Banks. (Gill, Patricia)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Sarah Banks Proposed Summonses for City of Greensboro, AL and Aaron Evans, Sr. (Gill, Patricia)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Greensboro, Alabama, Aaron Evans, Sr ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2333093, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Sarah Banks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit A- Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit exhibit B- Right to Sue Letter) (Gill, Patricia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (srr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. City of Greensboro, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Evans, Sr.
Represented By: Thomas O. Gaillard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Greensboro, Alabama
Represented By: Alan Courtney Crowder
Represented By: Bruce Harrison Henderson
Represented By: Dennis Steverson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Banks
Represented By: Patricia A. Gill
Represented By: Julie Lynn Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?