Carlisle v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Freddie L. Carlisle, Jr.
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00046
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service, Attorney General of the United States served on 2/12/19. (tot)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IV, served 2/12/19. (tot)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Lee Wiseman on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (Wiseman, Holly)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 2/7/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (srd)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 02/06/2019. (skb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill (SSA, U.S. Attny Gen, & U.S. Attny). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2019: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (skb).
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Freddie L. Carlisle, Jr (Grecu, Monica)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING Plf's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as set out. The Clerk is directed to serve a summons, along w/the #1 Complaint, on Dft as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/5/19. (tot)
February 5, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (tot)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Freddie L. Carlisle, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) (Grecu, Monica)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Freddie L. Carlisle, Jr. (Grecu, Monica)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill ( IFP.), filed by Freddie L. Carlisle, Jr. (Grecu, Monica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlisle v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie L. Carlisle, Jr.
Represented By: Monica H. Grecu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?