Jones v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Annie B. Jones
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00201
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Annie B. Jones. Social Security Administration (Atlanta) served on 4/29/2019. (Grecu, Monica) Modified on 5/13/2019 (tgw).
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Lee Wiseman on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (Wiseman, Holly)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/24/2019. (tgw)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorney's Office. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (tgw)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Annie B. Jones (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) (Grecu, Monica)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2388443, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Annie B. Jones. (Grecu, Monica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw). (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/24/2019) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie B. Jones
Represented By: Monica H. Grecu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?